LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01041 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
C.R. Bard, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 04/24 8:29 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1041. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Fri 04/05 2:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Fri 04/05 10:48 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on April 5, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Thu 04/04 3:23 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:06 PM
Summons Service Executed on C.R. Bard, Inc. 2/1/2019 (Hunton & Williams - NY) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on C.R. Bard, Inc. 2/1/2019 (c/o Hunton & Williams - NJ) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on C.R. Bard, Inc. 2/1/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 01/31 9:38 AM
Summons Issued on C.R. Bard, Inc. Answer Due 3/4/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/30 3:10 PM
Adversary case 19-01041 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against C.R. Bard, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |