LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA)
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01050 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 11, 2020 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 06/11 3:12 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1050. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, May 27, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Wed 05/27 2:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
7 | 7
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Wed 05/27 2:13 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Signed on May 27, 2020. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Wed 05/27 1:19 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA) 2/1/2019 (c/o A. Wimble) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:35 PM
Summons Service Executed on Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA) 2/1/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA) 2/1/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 01/31 9:55 AM
Summons Issued on Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA) Answer Due 3/4/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/30 3:44 PM
Adversary case 19-01050 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Red Hawk Fire & Security, LLC (LA). Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |