LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Star Service, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01053 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Star Service, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 05/24 2:03 PM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1053. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
miscap
Certificate of Service (PF)
Thu 05/09 1:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator |
|
6 | 6
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 05/09 12:54 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on May 9, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Tue 04/23 11:24 AM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Nobles, Cherie) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Star Service, Inc. 2/1/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Star Service, Inc. 2/1/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 01/31 10:00 AM
Summons Issued on Star Service, Inc. Answer Due 3/4/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/30 4:01 PM
Adversary case 19-01053 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Star Service, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |