LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator v. Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinn
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Lead BK case is: 2:17-bk-10353
Louisiana Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Brown |
Case #: | 2:19-ap-01057 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:07 PM CDT |
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/02 9:31 AM
Adversary Case Closed 2:19-ap-1057. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Order) (AP)
Thu 07/18 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on July 18, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) (AP)
Wed 07/17 2:08 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Time (Order)
Tue 04/30 2:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on April 30, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Tue 04/30 2:38 PM
Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 5/26/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
motion
03Extend Time
Mon 04/29 4:04 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings) Filed by Albert J. Derbes IV of The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C. on behalf of Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. (Derbes, Albert) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Extend Time (Order)
Fri 04/12 11:02 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on April 12, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Fri 04/12 11:06 AM
Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 4/26/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
03Extend Time
Thu 04/11 2:16 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time To File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Albert J. Derbes IV of The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C. on behalf of Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. (Derbes, Albert) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time (Order)
Fri 03/22 11:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 22, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Fri 03/22 11:20 AM
Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 4/12/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
03Extend Time
Wed 03/20 3:06 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to file responsive pleadings Filed by Albert J. Derbes IV of The Derbes Law Firm, L.L.C. on behalf of Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. (Derbes, Albert) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Extend Time (Order) (AP)
Wed 03/06 2:57 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Plead IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant shall serve this order on the required parties who will not receive notice through the ECF System pursuant to the FRBP and the LBRs and file a certificate of service to that effect within three (3) days. Signed on March 6, 2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
utility
Reset Answer Deadline (AP)
Wed 03/06 3:00 PM
Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. Answer Deadline Reset for 3/22/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extend Time (Motion) (AP)
Fri 03/01 4:10 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings Filed by Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. (Derbes, Albert) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. 2/1/2019 (Officer/Agent) . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 02/08 2:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. 2/1/2019 . (Manthey, Tristan) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (AP)
Thu 01/31 10:08 AM
Summons Issued on Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc. Answer Due 3/4/2019. (McIlwain, A.) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/30 4:40 PM
Adversary case 19-01057 Complaint by LMCHH PCP, LLC et al Plan Administrator against Southern Medical Holding Corporation n/k/a Cincinnati Unlocking, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Manthey, Tristan) |