Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:19-ap-05005
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2019
Terminated:Dec 16, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brock Solutions U.S., Inc.
5950 Berkshire Lane
Dallas, TX 15225
Represented By
Brock Solutions U.S., Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/16 8:38 AM
Disposition of Adversary 5:19-ap-5005 Case Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/16 8:39 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5005 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2019
24 24 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/26 2:39 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
23 23 misc Document Tue 10/15 2:34 PM
Document Fourth Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 22
Monday, September 09, 2019
22 22 misc Document Mon 09/09 12:45 PM
Document Third Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 21 ,14
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
21 21 misc Document Tue 07/16 5:20 PM
Document Second Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, June 27, 2019
20 20 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 06/28 12:25 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/27/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
19 19 13 pgs order Order (PDF) Tue 06/25 4:59 PM
Stipulated Protective Order Signed on 6/25/2019 Related [+]. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 18 Motion for Protective Order
18 18 motion Protective Order Tue 06/25 1:00 PM
Motion for Protective Order Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Saturday, June 22, 2019
17 17 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sun 06/23 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, June 20, 2019
16 16 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Thu 06/20 4:12 PM
Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 6/20/2019 Related [+].This adversary proceeding came before the court on June 20, 2019, for a further pretrial scheduling conference on Plaintiffs Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 (Complaint) [Doc.# 1]. The deadline for filing any motion for summary judgment is October 28, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
15 15 court Proceeding Memo Thu 06/20 11:32 AM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 6/20/19. Motion cut off 10/28/19 (summary judgement) (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 13, 2019
14 14 misc Document Thu 06/13 6:03 PM
Document Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 12
Saturday, March 16, 2019
13 13 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sun 03/17 12:22 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, March 14, 2019
12 12 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 03/14 4:16 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 3/14/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. The court will conduct a Further Pretrial Scheduling Conference on the Complaint on June 20, 2019, at 10:00 oclock a.m. Telephone appearances will be permitted with separate advance notice to the court. The deadline for Defendant to file a supplement to its answer to address consent status as required by Bankruptcy Rule 7008 is March 20, 2019. No motion deadline is being set at this time pending completion of discovery and the further pretrial conference set above. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by July 15, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by August 23, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by June 14, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/14 3:11 PM
Supplemental Answer to Complaint Filed by Brock Solutions U.S., Inc.. (Moore, James aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
10 10 court Proceeding Memo Wed 03/13 2:03 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 3/13/19. Adjourned to 6/20/19 at 9:30 AM. Discovery cutoff 6/14/19 for 1. Plf expert disclosure(s) and report(s): Due 7/15/19Def's expert dislcosure(s) and report(s): Due 8/23/19 2. Supplement to answer ro address Rule 7008 consent due 3/20.19. (dzeme) Modified on 3/13/2019 (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, March 11, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/11 4:02 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Brock Solutions U.S., Inc.. (Moore, James aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
8 8 misc Document Tue 03/05 1:43 PM
Document Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
7 7 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 02/07 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/05 11:41 AM
Summons Service Executed on Brock Solutions U.S., Inc. 2/5/2019 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 02/04 4:07 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Brock Solutions U.S., Inc. Answer due 3/6/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Toledo AP procedures memo
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 02/04 10:58 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+]. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Case Reassigned Mon 02/04 3:16 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (mshai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/31 1:36 PM
Adversary case 19-05005 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Brock Solutions U.S., Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A