Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:19-ap-05007
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2019
Terminated:Aug 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mielke Mechanical, Inc.
3029 Smith Road Suite 100
Fairlawn, OH 44333
Represented By
Mielke Mechanical, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Maria Carr
Mcdonald Hopkins LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, August 12, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 08/12 9:05 AM
Disposition of Adversary 5:19-ap-5007 (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/12 9:06 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5007 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 07/26 4:45 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2019
16 16 misc Status Report Fri 07/12 11:50 AM
Status Report Status Report Regarding Settlement Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 14
Saturday, June 22, 2019
15 15 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Sun 06/23 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/22/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, June 20, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Thu 06/20 4:14 PM
Second Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 6/20/2019 Related [+]. This adversary proceeding came before the court on March 13, 2019, for a further pretrial scheduling conference on Plaintiffs Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 (Complaint) [Doc.# 1]. The Plaintiff shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a status report on or before July 12, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 court Proceeding Memo Thu 06/20 11:31 AM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 6/20/19. Settled. Stipulation/ notice of dismissal or status report due by 7/12/19. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, June 13, 2019
12 12 court Document Thu 06/13 3:20 PM
Document Stipulation Extending Discovery Deadlines Filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee Related [+]. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] 10 Set Hearing (PDF)
Saturday, March 16, 2019
11 11 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sun 03/17 12:22 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, March 14, 2019
10 10 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 03/14 4:20 PM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 3/14/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2019 at 10:15 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by July 15, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by August 23, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by June 14, 2019. The court will conduct a Further Pretrial Scheduling Conference on the Complaint on June 20, 2019, at 10:15 oclock a.m. Telephone appearances will be permitted withseparate advance notice to the court. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
9 9 court Proceeding Memo Wed 03/13 2:11 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 3/13/19. Adjourned to 6/20/19 at 10:15 AM. Discovery Cutoff 6/14/19 for fact discovery. Plf's expert dislcosure(s) and reports(s): Due 7/15/19Def's expert dislcosure(s) and report(s): Due 8/23/19 (dzeme) Modified on 3/13/2019 (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/05 4:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Mielke Mechanical, Inc.. (Schwieg, Frederic aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
7 7 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 02/07 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/05 11:43 AM
Summons Service Executed on Mielke Mechanical, Inc. 2/5/2019 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 02/04 4:12 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Mielke Mechanical, Inc. Answer due 3/6/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 01:50 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 02/04 10:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+]. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Case Reassigned Mon 02/04 3:17 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (mshai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/31 1:50 PM
Adversary case 19-05007 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Mielke Mechanical, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A