Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:17-bk-52170

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:19-ap-05010
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2019
Terminated:Jan 13, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Starr Manufacturing, Inc.
5000 East Market Street Suite 33
Warren, OH 44484
Represented By
Starr Manufacturing, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
600 Superior Avenue E Suite 2100
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Ashley Jennifer Jericho
Attn: Ashley J. Jericho
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, January 13, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/13 2:39 PM
Disposition of Adversary 5:19-ap-5010 Case Dismissed. (dzeme)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/13 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5010 Closed (dzeme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/19 3:42 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2019
15 15 answer Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 03/20 12:10 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Starr Manufacturing, Inc. (Nader, Thomas aty)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2019
14 14 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Mon 03/18 12:20 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/17/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, March 16, 2019
13 13 BNC Notice of Order to Set Hearing (PDF) Sun 03/17 12:22 AM
Notice of Order to Set Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, March 14, 2019
12 12 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 03/14 5:03 PM
Amended Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order Signed on 3/14/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by July 15, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by August 23, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by June 14, 2019. The court will conduct a Further Pretrial Scheduling Conference on the Complaint on June 20, 2019, at 10:30 oclock a.m. Telephone appearances will be permitted with separate advance notice to the court. The deadline for Defendant to file a supplement to its answer to address consent status as required by Bankruptcy Rule 7008 is March 22, 2019. (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
11 11 order Set Hearing (PDF) Thu 03/14 4:42 PM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed on 3/14/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2019 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. Plaintiffs Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report are due by July 15, 2019. Defendants Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) expert disclosure(s), if any, and report, are due by August 23, 2019. All non-expert discovery must be commenced in time to be completed by June 14, 2019. The court will conduct a Further Pretrial Scheduling Conference on the Complaint on June 20, 2019, at 10:30 oclock a.m. Telephone appearances will be permitted with separate advance notice to the court. The deadline for Defendant to file a supplement to its answer to address consent status as required by Bankruptcy Rule 7008 is March 23, 2019. (The deadline stated in the Proceeding Memo is March 22, 2019, however, that is a Sunday.) (dzeme crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
10 10 court Proceeding Memo Wed 03/13 2:34 PM
Proceeding Memo Related [+] Hearing held 3/13/19. Adjourned to 6/20/19 at 10:30 AM. Discovery cut off 6/14/19. For fact discovery.1. . Plff's expert disclosure(s) and report(s) due 7/15/19.Def's expert dislcosure(s) and report(s) due 8/23/19.2. Def.to file Rule 7008 statement regarding consent, in form of supplement to answer. Due 3/22/19. (dzeme)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/27 2:52 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Starr Manufacturing, Inc.. (Nader, Thomas aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
8 8 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Thu 02/07 12:23 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 02/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Malloy, Sean aty)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 02/06 9:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee. (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/05 11:44 AM
Summons Service Executed on Starr Manufacturing, Inc. 2/5/2019 (Carr, Maria aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
4 4 court Document Mon 02/04 4:30 PM
CORRECTED SUMMONS - to insert correct attorney for plaintiff. All other dates, times, and information remains the same. Related [+] (mshai)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 02/04 4:18 PM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Starr Manufacturing, Inc. Answer due 3/6/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/13/2019 at 02:20 PM at Courtroom #2 Toledo. (mshai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo
2 2 2 pgs order Order (PDF) Mon 02/04 11:00 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+]. (spete crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Case Reassigned Mon 02/04 3:18 PM
Judge MARY ANN WHIPPLE added to case. Involvement of Judge ALAN M. KOSCHIK Terminated (mshai)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 31, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/31 2:16 PM
Adversary case 19-05010 Complaint by Richard Szekelyi, Liquidating Trustee against Starr Manufacturing, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Nature of Suit:12 Related [+] (Jericho, Ashley aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
Att: 1 Exhibit A