North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Case #: 1:19-mc-00013
Causeno cause specified
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2019
Terminated:Sep 03, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
order Order Wed 10/25 5:23 PM
TEXT ORDER issued by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/25/2023. Jason Keith entered an appearance for a criminal defendant in 23cr186, US v. Jones. Upon this order being called to his attention in that matter, he orally moved to withdraw, which was allowed. See ECF docket in 23cr186, Text Order 10/24/23 and Minute Entry 10/25/23. (Marsh, Keah)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2019
13 13 22 pgs appeal-cr Appeal Transcript Fri 05/03 7:45 PM
TRANSCRIPT filed for dates of 03-14-19, before Judge Catherine C. Eagles, re Show Cause Hearing, Court Reporter Briana L. Bell, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Email: brinesbit@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.

NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.

Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? y

Redaction Request due 5/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2019. (Bell, Briana)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
12 12 6 pgs order Order Mon 03/18 1:47 PM
ORDER OF DISCIPLINE signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 3/18/2019 as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 03/14 10:12 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES: Attorneys Duane Bryant and Bruce Lee appeared as counsel for Jason Keith. Show Cause Hearing held on 3/14/2019. Court sanctions Attorney Jason Keith and imposes restrictions on his ability to practice. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter Briana Bell.) (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
11 11 7 pgs respm Response Thu 03/07 5:01 PM
RESPONSE filed by IN RE: JASON KEITH, ATTORNEY. (BRYANT, DUANE)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/04 11:41 AM
ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 3/4/2019. The motion to extend time (Doc.9 ) is GRANTED and the Respondent's deadline to file a Response is extended until 3/7/2019. (Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Referred Mon 03/04 9:25 AM
Motions Referred: RE:9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 02, 2019
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Sat 03/02 6:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by IN RE: JASON KEITH, ATTORNEY.(BRYANT, DUANE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
8 8 notice-cr Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant Tue 02/19 7:08 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: BRUCE ALAN LEE (LEE, BRUCE)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/19 6:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DUANE KENNETH BRYANT on behalf of In Re IN RE: JASON KEITH, ATTORNEY (BRYANT, DUANE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
6 6 service USMS Return Executed Wed 02/06 3:29 PM
USMS Return Executed of Show Cause Order on 02/06/2019 as to JASON KEITH, ATTORNEY. (Taylor, Abby)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
5 5 misc SEALED Transcript Mon 02/04 9:16 AM
SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/19/2018, before Judge William L. Osteen, Jr. (Armstrong, Joe)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc SEALED Transcript Mon 02/04 9:14 AM
SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/15/2018, before Judge William L. Osteen, Jr. (Armstrong, Joe)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc SEALED Transcript Mon 02/04 9:10 AM
SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on September 26, 2018, before Judge Tilley. (Calhoun, J.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc SEALED Transcript Mon 02/04 9:07 AM
SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on August 30, 2018, before Judge Tilley. (Calhoun, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 01, 2019
1 1 17 pgs order Order Fri 02/01 3:32 PM
SHOW CAUSE ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 2/1/2019; that: 1. Jason Keith shall appear before the Court on Thursday, March 14, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. and may show cause why appropriate discipline should not be imposed for failure to provide competent representation and other violations of the North Carolina Rules of Professional Conduct in criminal proceedings in this Court as set forth herein. 2. Any counsel representing Mr. Keith in this matter must enter a written notice of appearance no later than three weeks before the scheduled hearing. Mr. Keith shall file any documentary evidence no later than two weeks before the scheduled hearing, under seal if appropriate. If Mr. Keith intends to call witnesses, he shall file a list of any witnesses who may testify on his behalf no later than two weeks before the scheduled hearing. If Mr. Keith wishes to file a brief, it must be filed no later than ten days before the scheduled hearing. All references to documentary evidence must be supported by clear citations to the CM-ECF docket and page number in this case or the appropriate underlying criminal case or by reference to the name of the witness expected to so testify. 3. The Clerk shall cause a copy of this Order to be sent by registered or certified mail to Mr. Keith and shall provide a copy to the Marshal who shall serve Mr. Keith in person. 4. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this Order to the North Carolina State Bar, to the United States Attorney, to the Federal Defender, and to the Chief Judges of the United States District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of North Carolina. 5. The Court requests the State Bar to provide to the Clerk by February 18, 2019, a copy of any actions it has taken to impose any sort of discipline on Mr. Keith, including warnings or letters of caution. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/01 3:35 PM
Set Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 3/14/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3 before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]