New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:19-cv-04551
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Terminated:Aug 23, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2019 5:48 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC ENTITIES 1-10
Defendant
ACT, INC.
Represented By
SHAJI M. EAPEN
Morgan, Melhuish & Abrutyn, Esqs.
contact info
Defendant
JANE DOES 1-10
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Plaintiff
CLARE CAROLYN
Represented By
PATRICK J. CLARE
Clare & Scott, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRENDAN CLARE
Represented By
PATRICK J. CLARE
Clare & Scott, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 23, 2019
26 26 misc Letter: Remand Fri 08/23 3:56 PM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Somerset County Courthouse 20 North Bridge Street Somerville, NJ 08876-1262 State No: SOM-L-1067-18. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (km)
Related: [-]
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Fri 08/23 3:54 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/23/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 08/23 3:58 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
24 24 minutes Motion Hearing Fri 08/23 12:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2019 re8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey filed by BRENDAN CLARE, CAROLYN CLARE. Decision read into the record. Ordered Motion granted. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
23 23 misc Certification Wed 08/21 4:17 PM
Certification of Caroline M. Mew on behalf of ACT, INC. Re22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/21 9:56 AM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Admit Caroline M. Mew, Esq. by ACT, INC..(EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Shaji M. Eapen, Esq.,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Caroline M. Mew, Esq.,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Caroline M. Mew, Esq.
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/21 3:33 PM
Set Deadlines as to22 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Admit Caroline M. Mew, Esq. . Motion set for 9/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney Wed 08/21 3:39 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certification of Caroline M. Mew attached to the22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice submitted by Shaji Eapen on 8/21/2019 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATION WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE USING Civil - Other Filings - Other Documents - Certification. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
21 21 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/13 5:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of counsels' correspondence (ECF Nos.19 ,20 ), oral argument regarding the Motion to Remand (ECF No.8 ) is rescheduled to Thursday, August 22, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/13/2019. (gxh)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Letter Tue 08/13 12:17 PM
Letter from Shaji M. Eapen re: Letter to Court re oral argument on Motion to Remand re19 Letter,8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey . (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Letter Tue 08/13 8:53 AM
Letter from Patrick J. Clare, Esq.. (CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
18 18 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 08/09 10:09 AM
TEXT ORDER: Oral argument regarding the Motion to Remand (ECF No.8 ) is scheduled for Thursday, August 15, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5W. If there are any conflicts with August 15, 2019, counsel shall e-file correspondence by 1:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 13, 2019 that provides a minimum of two joint proposed alternative oral argument dates/times from the following dates: Friday, August 16, 2019; Monday, August 19, 2019; Tuesday, August 20, 2019; and Wednesday, August 21, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/9/2019. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
17 17 misc Certification Mon 03/25 4:00 PM
Certification of Patrick J. Clare, Esq. on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re16 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,,. (CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 03/25 3:07 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey (CLARE, PATRICK) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit I,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service
Monday, March 18, 2019
15 15 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/18 3:42 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ACT, INC. re8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
14 14 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 03/13 10:56 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon review of Plaintiffs' correspondence (ECF No.13 ) requesting an adjournment of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.11 ). The Court finds good cause to administratively terminate Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.11 ) and Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (ECF No.12 ) pending the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (ECF No.8 ). The Court will enter an appropriate order following its decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. Should the Court elect to hear oral arguments on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, the Court will issue a separate text order to that effect. Furthermore, Counsel is advised that the Motion Day is a scheduling device, not the day the motion will be decided by the Court. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 3/13/2019. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
13 13 misc Letter Fri 03/08 3:57 PM
Letter from Patrick J. Clare. (CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Fri 03/08 3:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct to allow filing of third amended complaint by All Plaintiffs.(CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certification of Service,
Att: 2 Brief Brief,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibits A-F
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/08 3:52 PM
Set Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Amend Complaint to allow filing of third amended complaint . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 03/05 3:12 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee of $150 received as to Robert A. Burgoyne, Esq., receipt number TRE100350 (mps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/26 8:41 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT . Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 02/25 5:42 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by ACT, INC.. Responses due by 3/18/2019(EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 2 Brief MEMORANDUM OF LAW,
Att: 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT TO MEMORANDUM OF LAW,
Att: 4 Declaration DECLARATION OF RACHEL MARQUARDT,
Att: 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION PART 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION PART 2
10 10 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Mon 02/25 12:24 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ACT, INC. re8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey LETTER REQUESTING 3-18-19 MOTION BE ADJOURNED TO 4-1-19 (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/25 3:04 PM
Reset Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey . Motion reset for 4/1/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
9 9 misc Letter Fri 02/22 3:39 PM
Letter from Patrick J. Clare, Esq. re8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey . (CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Remand Fri 02/22 1:34 PM
First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey by All Plaintiffs.(CLARE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certification of Service,
Att: 2 Certification Certification with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Brief Brief
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/22 3:53 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey . Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
7 7 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 02/08 10:39 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Letter from Shaji M. Eapen, Esq.to the Clerk of the Court re Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b)... (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 02/08 10:28 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Request for an Automatic Clerk's Extension, d.e.4 , filed by Shaji M. Eapen on 2/6/2017 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Request for a Clerk's Extension under Rule 6.1 USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents -Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (km)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 02/08 11:48 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ACT, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/25/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
6 6 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/07 9:08 AM
CONSENT ORDER Granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Robert A. Burgoyne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/6/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/06 4:42 PM
LETTER ORDER Adjourning the 4/1/2019 Scheduling Conference. The Parties shall advise the Court in writing when the motion has been decided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/6/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter Wed 02/06 3:34 PM
Letter from Shaji M. Eapen, Esq.to the Clerk of the Court re Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.1(b). (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
3 3 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 02/05 11:41 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2019 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/5/2019. (km)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/05 8:57 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACT, INC.. (EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/04 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ACT, INC. from Superior Court Somerset County, case number SOM L 1067 18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9377670), filed by ACT, INC..(EAPEN, SHAJI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B.1,
Att: 3 Exhibit B.2,
Att: 4 Exhibit B.3,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 2 pgs Statement Disclosure
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 02/04 4:49 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jmh)
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -The Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shaji Eapen on 02/04/2019 was submitted as an attachment to the complaint. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under other filings, other documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court.
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Mon 02/04 4:56 PM
Related: [-]