Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy G Edmunds
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:19-cv-10336
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Terminated:Nov 20, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2019 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC
Represented By
James Andrew Merriman
Merriman Law Office, PLC
contact info
Matthew A. Hood
Stuart And Johnston, LLC
contact info
Andrew Stuart
Stuart And Johnston, LLC
contact info
Randall A. Constantine
Mazursky Constantine LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Codie Horn
3121 Belle Terre
Commerce Township, MI 48382

GPO Jun 01 2020
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
GPO Jul 08 2020
OPINION and ORDER Accepting and Adopting 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
GPO Nov 20 2020
ORDER Granting 24 Motion to Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
GPO Nov 20 2020
JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, November 20, 2020
31 31 order Judgment* Fri 11/20 11:12 AM
JUDGMENT - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 11/20 11:11 AM
ORDER Granting24 Motion to Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 11/20 11:16 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re30 Order on Motion to Dismiss,31 Judgment on Codie Horn at foursquare321@yahoo.com (the Court does not have a current mailing address for Codie Horn). (LBar)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 11/20 11:34 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re30 Order on Motion to Dismiss,31 Judgment on Codie Horn at 1004 Lakeview Drive, Wolverine Lake, Michigan 48390 (LBar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 23, 2020
29 29 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/26 10:11 AM
COPY of27 Order mailed to Codie Horn and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 24, 2020
27 27 order Vacate Thu 09/24 1:19 PM
ORDER Vacating4 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 09/24 1:01 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (LBar)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Thu 09/24 10:23 AM
ORDER Requiring Response to24 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 10/14/2020 Reply due by 10/28/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 10:26 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re25 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Codie Horn at 3121 BELLE TERRE, COMMERCE TOWNSHIP, MI 48382. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 09/24 1:32 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re26 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes,27 Order to Vacate,25 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Codie Horn at 3121 Belle Terre, Commerce Township, MI 48382 and at foursquare321@yahoo.com (LBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
24 24 motion Dismiss Wed 09/23 10:36 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
23 23 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/13 2:32 PM
COPY of22 Opinion and order mailed to Codie Horn and returned as undeliverable (DPer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
order Text-Only Order Wed 07/15 2:32 PM
TEXT-ONLY: Case settled, stipulated order of dismissal to be submitted within 30 days. Entered by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 08, 2020
22 22 2 pgs order Memorandum Opinion & Order Wed 07/08 9:06 AM
OPINION and ORDER Accepting and Adopting20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 07/08 9:08 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re22 Memorandum Opinion & Order on Codie Horn at 3121 Belle Terre, Commerce Township, MI 48382 (LBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2020
21 21 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 06/01 9:47 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Report and Recommendation Mon 06/01 9:44 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 06/01 9:51 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re21 Order on Motion to Compel,20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC on Codie Horn at 3121 BELLE TERRE, COMMERCE TOWNSHIP, MI 48382. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2020
19 19 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 05/27 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING BY TELEPHONE on13 MOTION to Compel,11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 05/27 9:57 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re19 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Codie Horn at foursquare321@yahoo.com (EBut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 26, 2020
18 18 notice Appear* Tue 05/26 9:16 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 5/27/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 05/26 9:21 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re18 Notice to Appear on Codie Horn at foursquare321@yahoo.com (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2019
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/13 9:52 AM
REPLY to Response re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
16 16 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/12 8:20 AM
RESPONSE to11 Motion for summary judgment filed by Codie Horn. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation
Thursday, November 07, 2019
15 15 respm Response to Motion Thu 11/07 4:19 PM
RESPONSE to13 MOTION to Compel filed by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Monday, November 04, 2019
14 14 notice Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument* Mon 11/04 3:24 PM
Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re13 MOTION to Compel,11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 3:28 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re14 Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument on Codie Horn at 3121 BELLE TERRE, COMMERCE TOWNSHIP, MI 48382. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
13 13 motion Compel Mon 10/28 10:05 AM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Codie Horn. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
12 12 trial Exhibit Fri 10/25 6:38 PM
EXHIBIT A in Support of Bosch's Motion for Summary Judgment - Deposition of Codie Horn re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Summary Judgment Fri 10/25 5:51 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Wes Johnson,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Employee Handbook,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Handbook Acknowledgement,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Offer Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Job Description,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Unapproved Travel Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Approved Travel Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - May 7, 2018 Meeting Invite,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - May 8, 2018 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Email to Ms. King,
Att: 11 Exhibit 15 - May 7, 2018 Email from Ms. Clark to Ms. King,
Att: 12 Exhibit 16 - Administrative Change Form - Termination Document,
Att: 13 Index of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Friday, August 02, 2019
10 10 trial Witness List Fri 08/02 2:53 PM
WITNESS LIST by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/21 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 9/20/2019 Discovery due by 10/25/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Related [+] (EBut)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Status Conference Thu 03/21 4:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 3/21/2019, Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/21/2019. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 03/21 4:36 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Scheduling Order on Codie Horn at 3121 BELLE TERRE, COMMERCE TOWNSHIP,MI 48382. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
8 8 notice Appear* Wed 03/06 1:31 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand Status Conference set for 3/21/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Wed 03/06 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Merriman on behalf of Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Merriman, James)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 03/06 1:32 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re8 Notice to Appear, on Codie Horn at 3121 BELLE TERRE, COMMERCE TOWNSHIP, MI 48382. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 03/05 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Stuart on behalf of Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Stuart, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 03/05 12:09 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew A. Hood appearing on behalf of Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC (Hood, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
4 4 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Tue 02/12 1:43 PM
ORDER Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 02/11 4:22 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC (Constantine, Randall)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/11 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC. (Constantine, Randall)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Mon 02/04 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Bosch Automotive Steering LLC from State of Michigan, Third Judicial Circuit, Wayne County, case number 19-000278-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7092217 - Fee: $ 400 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Constantine, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B: State Court Notice of Removal
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 02/04 4:33 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]