Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:19-cv-00152
Nature of Suit140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2019 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Matthew D. Morton
Mccalla Raymer, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pierre Gustave Lepoureau
St. Augustine, FL 32084


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
35 35 6 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Tue 01/28 5:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Court of Record Tort Claim Petition. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/28/2020. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
34 34 4 pgs order Order on motion to stay discovery Mon 11/18 5:41 PM
ORDER granting 25 Motion to stay discovery. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/18/2019. (MM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2019
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/06 6:11 PM
NOTICE by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau re20 Case management and scheduling order PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS (Lepoureau, Pierre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
32 32 respoth Response Tue 10/29 9:33 AM
RESPONSE re30 Notice (Other),31 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Gufford, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/15 9:42 AM
NOTICE by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau re30 Notice (Other) Service Date Correction (Lepoureau, Pierre)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 4:22 PM
NOTICE by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau Non-Compliance to Service (Lepoureau, Pierre)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 8:52 AM
NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. re26 Response in Opposition to Motion of Untimely Filed Response (Gufford, Charles)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 8:49 AM
NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. re10 MOTION to Dismiss Court of Record Tort Claim Petition per Rule 3.01(h) (Gufford, Charles)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/11 8:46 AM
NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Change of Counsel within Firm (Gufford, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/08 1:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re25 MOTION to stay discovery filed by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (Lepoureau, Pierre)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
25 25 motion Stay discovery Fri 09/20 5:18 PM
MOTION to stay discovery by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
24 24 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/17 11:19 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Tue 09/17 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re20 Case management and scheduling order by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2019
22 22 motion Disclosure Mon 09/16 7:02 PM
First MOTION for Disclosure by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (Lepoureau, Pierre)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
21 21 misc Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Fri 09/13 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
20 20 order Case management and scheduling order Fri 08/23 1:00 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediator selection due by 11/15/2019; Discovery due by 1/16/2020; Dispositive motions due by 2/28/2020; Conduct mediation hearing by 4/30/2020; Pretrial statement due by 6/17/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Trial set for term commencing on 7/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/22/2019.(AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Docket Sheets
Tuesday, August 06, 2019
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/06 3:55 PM
ORDER granting 18 Pro se Plaintiff's Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/6/2019. (MM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 08/05 3:20 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically titled, "Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing" by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2019
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 07/30 6:40 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Permission for Electronic Filing. Plaintiff may file a renewed motion that includes a proper Local Rule 3.01(g) certification on or before August 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/30/2019. (MM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2019
16 16 misc Case Management Report Mon 07/29 3:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 07/29 3:46 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically titled, "Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing" by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order Tue 07/23 2:06 PM
ORDER directing the parties to file on or before August 9, 2019, the consent form allowing this case to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. If the form is not received by August 9, 2019, a Case Management and Scheduling Order will be prepared by the assigned District Judge. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/23/2019. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
13 13 misc Case Management Report Mon 07/15 7:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2019
12 12 respm Response to motion Mon 04/29 2:20 PM
RESPONSE to10 MOTION to Dismiss Court of Record Tort Claim Petition filed by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Related case order and track 2 notice Mon 04/29 10:22 AM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/29/2019.(CKS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Management Report Form,
Att: 2 Consent Letter and Form
Monday, April 15, 2019
10 10 motion Dismiss Mon 04/15 3:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Court of Record Tort Claim Petition by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2019
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/25 1:14 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand. filed by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau.(AEJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Monday, March 11, 2019
8 8 4 pgs order Order to strike Mon 03/11 4:44 PM
ORDER STRIKING 7 Plaintiff's Court of Record Tort Claim Petition and Request for Hearing or Trial by Jury. Plaintiff shall file on or before March 25, 2019, a second amended complaint consistent with the directives of this order. Failure to file a proper second amended complaint may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/11/2019. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/08 11:45 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand. filed by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau.(AEJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Monday, February 25, 2019
6 6 4 pgs order Order Mon 02/25 4:45 PM
ORDER STRIKING Complaint (Doc. 1-1). Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with the directives of this order on or before March 14, 2019. Failure to file a proper complaint may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/25/2019. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
5 5 misc Supplement Tue 02/19 2:01 PM
SUPPLEMENT Notice of Removal by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Morton, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal,
Att: 3 Exhibit All process, pleadings, orders, and other paper or exhibits of every kind on file with the state court and served on Chase,
Att: 4 Exhibit Sunbiz Records
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/06 3:23 PM
ORDER directing Defendant to supplement its Notice of Removal on or before February 20, 2019, to properly plead existence of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so may result in remand of this case without further notice. Plaintiff's Counterclaim of Wrongdoers Notice of Removal 3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/6/2019. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/05 2:56 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically titled, "Counterclaim of Wrongdoers Notice of Removal from the Circuit Court of the Seventh Judicial Circuit, in and for St. Johns County, Florida Case No: 2019-CA-0013 Request/Require/Demand: a Court of Record Hearing and Trial by Jury Want of Jurisdiction" by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau.(AEJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/05 2:48 PM
NOTICE of designation of e-mail address by Pierre Gustave Lepoureau (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/04 3:13 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 7th Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County, FL, case number CA19-0013 filed in State Court on 1/04/2019. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number JAX030085 filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(AEJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Pending Motions,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet