Duplin County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45040 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 7:19-cv-00012 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Kerr Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
King Drug Company of Florence
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Duplin County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:33 PM EDT |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4796856.), filed by Duplin County. (Coates, Paul) [Transferred from nced on 2/4/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil CoverSheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
Notice to Counsel - No summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 2/4/2019.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 2/4/2019.] | ||
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - This case is transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Stay lifted on 2/4/2019.) (Sellers, N.) [Transferred from nced on 2/4/2019.] | |
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 7:19-cv-00012. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |