City of Vienna, West Virginia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45042 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2019 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:19-cv-00052 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreen Company
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Vienna, West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:45 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 321 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7029043. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2019.] | |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2019.] | |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-77), MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2019.] | |
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-77) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 02/04/2019. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2019.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:19-cv-00052. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |