Bartow County, Georgia v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45045 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Northern, 4:19-cv-00007 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:09 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Harco, Inc. fka Harco Drug, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J. M. Smith Corp
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Kroger Co.
|
|
Plaintiff
Bartow County, Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:48 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 296 pgs COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Bartow County, Georgia. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8391036)(jta) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 2/5/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Harold L. Murphy recused. Case reassigned to Judge Orinda D. Evans for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:19-cv-7-ODE. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/17/19. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 2/5/2019.] | |
Monday, February 04, 2019 | ||
Case transferred electronically to District of ND Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 2/5/2019.] | ||
Civil Case Terminated. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 2/5/2019.] | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-77 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING action to the USDC ND Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jta) [Transferred from gand on 2/5/2019.] | |
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 4:19-cv-00007. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |