Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:18-bk-43284

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kathleen H Sanberg
Case #: 4:19-ap-04027
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Terminated:Oct 11, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Timothy J Hibbard
1606 10th Street South
Princeton, MN 55371
Plaintiff
Elizabeth A. Hibbard
35301 Jarvis St. NW
Princeton, MN 55371
Represented By
John D. Lamey, III
Lamey Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, October 11, 2019
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 10/11 9:39 AM
Adversary case 4:19-ap-4027 closed (Kathy MNBM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2019
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Thu 10/10 8:07 AM
Disposition of adversary 4:19-ap-4027. Disposition: dismissed with prejudice. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
11 11 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Wed 10/09 5:05 PM
Stipulation filed by Elizabeth A. Hibbard and Timothy J Hibbard. Nature of stipulation: Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2019
10 10 order MNB Order for trial Thu 03/21 4:15 PM
Scheduling Order and Order for Trial and for use of Electronic Evidence Related [+] Motions Due: 8/23/2019. Discovery due by 7/24/2019. Trial date set for 10/22/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 8 West, 8th Floor, 300 S 4th St, Minneapolis, Judge Kathleen H. Sanberg. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
9 9 answer MNB Answer to complaint Thu 03/21 1:10 PM
Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial filed by Timothy J Hibbard. (Dicker, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 09, 2019
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/09 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 03/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
7 7 order MNB Order (Generic) Thu 03/07 2:01 PM
Order Re: Related [+]. Notice of Entry affixed. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation to extend time to answer
6 6 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Thu 03/07 11:59 AM
Stipulation filed by Elizabeth A. Hibbard and Timothy J. Hibbard. Nature of stipulation: extention of time to answer complaint (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/07 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Tue 02/05 12:44 PM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Elizabeth A. Hibbard. (Lamey, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
3 3 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Tue 02/05 8:42 AM
Pro bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint. (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 02/05 8:41 AM
Summons issued on Timothy J Hibbard Date Issued 2/5/2019, Answer Due 3/7/2019 (Lynn MNBM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 02/04 5:04 PM
Adversary case 19-04027 (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Elizabeth Hibbard against Timothy J Hibbard. Fee Amount $350 (Lamey, John)
Related: [-]