New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-00058
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2019
Terminated:Jan 08, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 06, 2019 2:13 AM EST
Defendant
Patricia Hakim (1)
Represented By
Maureen S. Hoerger
Perini & Hoerger
contact info
Raymond G. Perini
Perini & Hoerger
contact info
Joel Mark Stein
Law Offices Of Joel M. Stein, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan C Harris
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Eastern District Of New York
contact info
Erin Reid
The United States Attorneys Office For The Eastern District
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/13/2022 10:57 AM EST
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Kaderrah Doyle (1), Cara Steinberg (2), Marina Golfo (3), Ego Onaga (4), Lyubov Beylina (5), Danielle Scopinich (6), Patricia Hakim (7), Enock Mensah (8). (Sica, Michele) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealing Cover Sheet
Thursday, October 04, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Kaderrah Doyle, Cara Steinberg, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Lyubov Beylina, Danielle Scopinich, Patricia Hakim, Enock Mensah. Attorney Erin Reid for USA added. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order to Unseal Case as to Kaderrah Doyle, Cara Steinberg, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Lyubov Beylina, Danielle Scopinich, Patricia Hakim, Enock Mensah. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/4/2018. (Chin, Felix) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
20 20 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by defendants Kaderrah Doyle, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Lyubov Beylina, Patricia Hakim, Enock Mensah (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
24 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara:Arraignments as to Kaderrah Doyle, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga and Patricia Hakim on Complaint held on 10/4/2018, Initial Appearance as to Kaderrah Doyle, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Patricia Hakim held on 10/4/2018, Attorney Appointment of federal defender Michael Schneider for the deft Kaderrah Doyle, CJA counsel Sally Butler for deft Marina Golfo, CJA counsel Gary Villanueva for deft Ego Onaga, and CJA counsel Joel Stein for deft Patricia Hakim held on 10/4/2018. AUSA Erin Reid present. Defendants Doyle, Onaga and Hakim released on a consent bond of $ 100,000, and deft Golfo of $150,000 bond with conditions. 2 suretors to cosign bond by 10/12/18 as to deft Hakim, and 1 to cosign by 10/12/18 as to deft Doyle. All 4 defendants waived preliminary hearing and time excluded from 10/4 to 11/5/18. (FTR Log #3;33-3;57.) (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
26 26 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Patricia Hakim (7) $100,000 bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/4/2018. (Yuen, Sui-May) (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/9/2018) (Yuen, Sui-May). [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Kaderrah Doyle, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Patricia Hakim Time excluded from 10/4/18 until 11/5/18.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/4/2018. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
33 33 CJA 20 as to Patricia Hakim: Appointment of Attorney Joel Mark Stein for Patricia Hakim.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/4/2018. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
Notice of Hearing as to Cara Steinberg, Ego Onaga, Patricia Hakim: Upon further review of the financial affidavits of defendants Ego Onaga and Patricia Hakim, it appears they are ineligible for Court-appointed CJA counsel. These defendants and their counsel are directed to appear for a hearing on Monday October 15, 2018 at 3:00 P.M. in Courtroom 4E North before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara . Defendant Cara Steinberg who appears not to have submitted a financial affidavit is directed to appear as well. The remaining defendants and their counsel may but are not required to attend the hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/9/2018. (Manson, Eddie) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
35 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Bond Hearing as to Patricia Hakim held on 10/9/2018 (FTR Log #11;42-11;48.) Clerk F Chin - 2 sureties advised of bond obligations and signed bond. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
36 36 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maureen S. Hoerger appearing for Patricia Hakim (Hoerger, Maureen) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Raymond G. Perini appearing for Patricia Hakim (Perini, Raymond) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
40 40 MOTION to Continue by Patricia Hakim. (Perini, Raymond) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 12, 2018
ORDER as to Patricia Hakim: In light of Defendant Hakim's letter indicting she has hired counsel, and is no longer using or in need of CJA counsel, her appearance is no longer required at the hearing on October 15, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 10/12/2018. (Manson, Eddie) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 15, 2018
Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Patricia Hakim: (Manson, Eddie) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
47 47 First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Patricia Hakim. (Perini, Raymond) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
48 48 ORDER granting47 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Patricia Hakim (7)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/26/2018. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
51 51 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael H. Handwerker appearing for Kaderrah Doyle, Cara Steinberg, Marina Golfo, Ego Onaga, Lyubov Beylina, Danielle Scopinich, Patricia Hakim, Enock Mensah (Handwerker, Michael) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2018
57 57 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patricia Hakim Time excluded from 11/5/18 until 1/5/19. Ordered by Chief Mag. Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/6/2018. (Chin, Felix) [1:18-mj-00927-VMS]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
66 66 8 pgs INDICTMENT as to Patricia Hakim (1) count(s) 1, 2. (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Information Sheet