Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Charles A Pannell, Jr
Case #: 1:19-cv-00640
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2019
Terminated:May 22, 2019
Last checked: Monday Aug 05, 2019 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Meridian Management Group, LLC
Defendant
Meridian Management Partners, LLC
Plaintiff
Ta'Mara DeShazor
Represented By
Andrew Brian Henson
The Vaughn Law Firm, Llc-D. Ga
contact info
Christopher D. Vaughn
The Vaughn Law Firm, Llc-D. Ga
contact info
Frank DeMelfi
The Vaughn Law Firm, Llc-D. Ga
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 05/22 3:10 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement. Having considered the Parties' Joint Motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED and the Settlement Agreement (the "Agreement") attached to the parties' Joint Motion is APPROVED. The Court hereby ORDERS that the parties comply with their respective obligations set forth in the Agreement. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is INSTRUCTED to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/22 3:22 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
9 9 motion For Settlement Tue 05/21 2:53 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval with Brief In Support by Ta'Mara DeShazor.(Vaughn, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 17, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/17 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Meridian Management Group, LLC, Meridian Management Partners, LLC (Keenan, Sean Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 05/07 3:48 PM
STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Meridian Management Group, LLC, Meridian Management Partners, LLC. (Keenan, Sean Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 04/03 1:48 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extending Time for Defendants to Answer by Meridian Management Group, LLC, Meridian Management Partners, LLC. (Keenan, Sean Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/13 4:21 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Meridian Management Group, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/13 4:16 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Meridian Management Partners, LLC. (tcc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Proposed Summons Wed 03/13 11:32 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ta'Mara DeShazor Meridian Management Partners, LLC (Vaughn, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Proposed Summons Wed 03/13 11:31 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Ta'Mara DeShazor Meridian Management Group, LLC (Vaughn, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 02/06 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Ta'Mara DeShazor. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8434081)(ddm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet