Board of County Commissioners of the County of Taos v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45051 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2019 |
Case in other court: | New Mexico, 1:19-cv-00056 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corp.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Board of County Commissioners of the County of Taos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:31 PM EDT |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6236190 re1 Complaint,,,, filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Taos (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Robles, Luis) [Transferred from nmd on 2/7/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 321 pgs COMPLAINT Complaint for Public Nuisance; Violations of Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act (RICO), 18 U.S.C. § 1961 et seq.; Violations of 18 U.S.C. § 1962 et seq.; Violations of NMSA 1978, § 30-42-1 et seq.; Negligence; Negligence Per Se; Civil Conspiracy; Fraud; and Unjust Enrichment against Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corp., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Wal-Mart Store, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Taos.(Robles, Luis) [Transferred from nmd on 2/7/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 2/7/2019.] | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 2/7/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 77) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (kg) [Transferred from nmd on 2/7/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico. Case number 1:19-cv-00056. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |