New Hampshire District Court
Case #: 1:19-cr-00004
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2019
Terminated:Jun 03, 2020
Last checked: Friday Feb 08, 2019 2:56 AM EST
Defendant
Laurel Bennett (2)
Defendant
Dean V. Smoronk (1)
Represented By
Kristin Weberg
Weberg Law Office
contact info
Michael D. Ramsdell
Ramsdell Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer C. Davis
Us Attorney'S Office (nh)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:27 AM EDT
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
ENDORSED ORDER granting 3 Motion to Seal Case at Level I until defendant is taken into custody as to Dean V. Smoronk (1). Text of Order: Motion Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Arrest Warrant Issued as to Dean V. Smoronk. Original warrant and copies to US Marshal and US Probation.(ko) Modified on 12/20/2018 to unseal (kad). [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone as to Dean V. Smoronk (1). Original document available in clerks office.(ko) Modified on 12/20/2018 to delete SEALED (kad). [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal Case at Level I until defendant is taken into custody by USA as to Dean V. Smoronk. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
Arrest of Dean V. Smoronk.(kad) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE to Attorneys of Record: Defendant taken into custody. The case has been unsealed. All future pleadings shall be filed in accordance with this district's Supplemental Rules for Electronic Case Filing. (kad) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Dean V. Smoronk held on 12/20/2018. Defendant advised of rights & charges. Court approves financial affidavit. Defendant temporary Detained. (Tape #4:11) (Govt Atty: Jennifer C. Davis) (Defts Atty: Michael D. Ramsdell) (USP: Janice Bernard)(Total Hearing Time: 3 minutes)(CJA Time: 1 hr, 14 minutes) (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dean V. Smoronk. Show Cause Hearing re: Indictment and compliance with 18:3161(b) is set for 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. HEARING WILL NOT BE NECESSARY IF MOTION TO EXTEND GRANTED OR INDICTMENT RETURNED PRIOR TO HEARING DATE. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
ENDORSED ORDER approving 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Dean V. Smoronk (1). Michael D. Ramsdell appointed in the case for initial appearance only. Assignment accepted on 12/20/2018. Text of Order: Request Approved. Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dean V. Smoronk. Preliminary Hearing/Detention Hearing set for 12/27/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel with Financial Declaration by Dean V. Smoronk. Document available in clerks office. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Financial Affidavit
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Dean V. Smoronk. Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing set for 12/27/2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed as to Dean V. Smoronk.(kad) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
NOTICE: Kristin Weberg appointed as counsel for Dean Smoronk by Dean V. Smoronk. (ko) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 27, 2018
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone: PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Dean V. Smoronk held on 12/27/2018. Witnesses: Timothy Keefe. Probable cause found. DETENTION HEARING as to Dean V. Smoronk held on 12/27/2018. Defendant detained, order to issue. (Tape #11:29) (Govt Atty: Jennifer Davis) (Defts Atty: Kristin Weberg) (USP: Eric Gray)(Total Hearing Time: 1 hr. 17 min.)(CJA Time: 1 hr. 18 min.) (kad) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Dean V. Smoronk. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (kad) [1:18-mj-00264-AJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 09, 2019
8 8 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to Dean V. Smoronk (1) count 1, Laurel Bennett (2) count 1. Original document available in clerks office.(cmp)
Related: [-]
10 10 Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Dean V. Smoronk. (cmp)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs Praecipe for Warrant by USA as to Laurel Bennett. (cmp)
Related: [-]