Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:18-bk-03635

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Karen S Jennemann
Case #: 6:19-ap-00037
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2019
Terminated:Feb 14, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Synchrony Bank
170 West Election Road Suite 125
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Synchrony Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Arvind Mahendru
5703 Red Bug Lake Road Suite 284
Winter Springs, FL 32708
Represented By
Brian L Shrader, Attorney for Trustee
Centrone & Shrader, PLLC
contact info
Gus M Centrone, Attorney for Trustee
Centrone & Shrader, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Tue 09/15 5:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by EO. Receipt Number 155735. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/14 7:51 AM
Adversary Case 6:19-ap-37 Closed. (Nita)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2020
24 24 misc Proof of Service Tue 01/28 1:30 PM
Proof of Service of Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. Filed by Brian L Shrader on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru Related [+]. (Shrader, Brian)
Related: [-] 23
23 23 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Tue 01/28 11:09 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice . Service Instructions: Brian Shrader is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Scott)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation Tue 01/28 10:08 AM
Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Filed by Brian L Shrader on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru. (Shrader, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2020
court Compromise Cross-Reference Mon 01/27 8:19 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:18-bk-03635-KSJ, Doc. No. 21 . (Rutha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
21 21 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Thu 01/23 12:13 AM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Brian Shrader (Plf Atty); Raymond Hora (Def Atty); RULING: ARVIND MAHENDRU V. SYNCHRONY BANK Pretrial Conference Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:18-bk-03635-KSJ Doc#17 - Granted:Order by Shrader; Adversary to be dismissed; (gw).. Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2019
20 20 misc Proof of Service Mon 12/16 7:48 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing. Filed by Brian L Shrader on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru Related [+]. (Shrader, Brian)
Related: [-] 18
audio xAudio Copy Mon 12/16 9:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2019
19 19 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Fri 12/13 3:41 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Arvind Mahendru (Trustee); Brian Shrader (Trustee Atty); Raymond Hora (Synchrony Bank Atty); RULING: TRIAL ARVIND MAHENDRU V. SYNCHRONY BANK; 1) Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing (Doc #16) - Granted continued to 1/22/20 at 11:00am; Order by Court (jk) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Reschedule Hearing Fri 12/13 1:33 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing on the Trial Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Brian Shrader is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Robert)
Related: [-] 16
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 12/13 7:56 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 6:18-bk-03635-KSJ Doc#17 . (Linda L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2019
17 17 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 12/12 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice as Additional Counsel for Synchrony Bank Filed by Raymond G Hora on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank. (Hora, Raymond)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2019
16 16 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing Thu 12/05 11:56 AM
Agreed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On Trial for Adversary Proceeding Filed by Brian L Shrader on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru Related [+]. (Shrader, Brian)
Related: [-] 14
Saturday, September 21, 2019
15 15 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Sat 09/21 12:01 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement Filed by Brian L Shrader, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru. (Shrader, Attorney for Trustee, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
14 14 2 pgs order Order Scheduling Trial (AP Case Trial) Tue 09/17 2:43 PM
Order Scheduling Trial on the Complaint Related [+]. Trial date set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. Service Instructions: Gus Centrone, Attorney for Trustee is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Robert)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
13 13 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Mon 09/16 5:01 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Brian Shrader (Trustee Atty); RULING: ARVIND MAHENDRU V. SYNCHRONY BANK Pretrial Conference - cont. to TRIAL on 12/13/2019 at 10:00 a.m. **CM TO PREPARE ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL** (gw). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
12 12 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 07/24 8:31 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Gus Centrone: Plf Atty; Brandon White: Def Atty (telephone); RULING: Pretrial Conference - cont. to 9/10/2019 at 2:00 p.m. (AOCNFNG) (gww). Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Dkt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2019
11 11 notice Notice Of Hearing Fri 04/26 10:10 AM
Amended Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (Pretrial Conference) Filed by Gus M Centrone, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2019 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Centrone, Attorney for Trustee, Gus)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
10 10 notice Notice Of Hearing Wed 04/24 1:53 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (Pretrial Conference) Filed by Brian L Shrader, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2019 at 02:00 PM at Orlando, FL - Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 W. Washington Street. (Shrader, Attorney for Trustee, Brian)
Related: [-] 2
Wednesday, April 10, 2019
9 9 order Extend Time Wed 04/10 10:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Through April 10, 2019) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Brandon White is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Linda L.)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, April 08, 2019
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 04/08 1:05 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Synchrony Financial. Filed by Brandon T White on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank. (White, Brandon)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/08 12:43 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Brandon T White on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank. (White, Brandon)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, April 01, 2019
6 6 misc Disclosure Mon 04/01 2:39 PM
Initial Disclosure Filed by Brian L Shrader, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru. (Shrader, Attorney for Trustee, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
5 5 motion Motion to Extend Time Mon 03/11 1:44 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Filed by Brandon T White on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank Related [+]. (White, Brandon)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, February 18, 2019
4 4 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/18 11:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brandon T White on behalf of Defendant Synchrony Bank. (White, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Tue 02/12 5:10 PM
Service Executed on Synchrony Bank of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Brian L Shrader, Attorney for Trustee on behalf of Plaintiff Arvind Mahendru. (Shrader, Attorney for Trustee, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 02/08 4:30 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 03/11/2019. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A Pretrial/Status Conference will be held in Courtroom 6A, 6th Floor, George C. Young Courthouse, 400 West Washington Street, Orlando, FL 32801, on July 23, 2019, at 2:00 PM. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint - Original Thu 02/07 3:40 PM
Complaint by Arvind Mahendru against Synchrony Bank. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Centrone, Attorney for Trustee, Gus)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other