United States of America v. Real property at 725 Main Street, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 373-192-007-4 et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale A Drozd |
Referred: | Deborah Barnes |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-00247 |
Nature of Suit | 690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2019 1:47 AM PDT |
Claimant
Paulette Carpoff
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
Jeffrey Carpoff
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
CTBC Bank Corp. (USA)
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
AMAC Construction and Restoration
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Heritage Bank of Commerce
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Real property at 3779 Overlook Court, South Lake Tahoe, California, El Dorado County, APN: 028-123-018-000
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 820 Shell Avenue, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 375-100-026
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 811 Brown Street, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APNs: 372-261-006 and 372-261-006-4
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 7373 E. Clubhouse Drive, Unit 14, Scottsdale, Arizona, Maricopa County, APN: 216-33-865
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 725 Main Street, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 373-192-007-4
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 4901 Park Road, Benicia, California, Solano County, APNs: 0080-060-360-01
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 4810 Blum Road, Unit 5, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 159-400-012-5
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 4800 Blum Road, Unit 3, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 159-400-003-4
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 4101 Lake Tahoe Blvd, Unit 225, South Lake Tahoe, California, El Dorado County, APN: 029-660-011-000
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 4101 Lake Tahoe Blvd, Unit 217, South Lake Tahoe, California, El Dorado County, APN: 029-660-005-000
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 40 Iris Lane, Walnut Creek, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 185-360-016-9
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 3143 Old Tunnel Road, Lafayette, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 185-062-033-5
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 1108 Juniper Avenue, South Lake Tahoe, California, El Dorado County, APN: 027-222-010-000
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 1208 Roseann Drive, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 162-375-007-0
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 140 Mason Circle, Concord, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 159-070-031-4
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 1619 Greenside Drive, Round Rock, Texas, Williamson County, Parcel Number: R487087
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 202 Valley View Place, El Sobrante, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 433-200-031
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 207 Valley View Place, El Sobrante, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 433-200-028
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 208 Valley View Place, El Sobrante, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 433-200-030
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 214 Valley View Place, El Sobrante, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 433-200-029
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 2375 Yale Street, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 376-032-007-1
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 250 Arana Drive, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 162-340-021
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 28 Millthwait Drive, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 367-121-002
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 30 Pebble Dunes Court, Las Vegas, Nevada, Clark County, APN: 191-06-214-002
|
|
Defendant
Real property at 31 Morello Heights Drive, Martinez, California, Contra Costa County, APN: 377-183-007
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Trustee
W. Donald Gieseke
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, December 14, 2022 | ||
94 | 94
5
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/14 9:41 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING RELATED CASES signed by Senior Judge John A. Mendez on 12/13/22 ORDERING that the presiding role in the actions denominated 2:22-CV-01726-DB, 2:20-cv-00180 JAM DB, 2:19-cv-00247 JAM DB, 2:19-cv-00485 JAM DB, 2:19-cv-00636 JAM DB, 2:19-cv- 2140 JAM DB, 2:19-cr-00222 JAM, 2:19-cv-02531 JAM DB, 2:20-cr- 00017 JAM, 2:20-cr-00018 JAM, 2:20-cr-00016 JAM and 2:19-cv-02544 JAM DB are REASSIGNED to District Judge Dale A. Drozd for all further proceedings, and that any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:22-CV-01726-DAD DB, 2:20- cv-00180 DAD DB, 2:19-cv-00247 DAD DB, 2:19-cv-00485 DAD DB, 2:19- cv-00636 DAD DB, 2:19-cv-02140 DAD DB, 2:19-cr-00222 DAD, 2:19-cv- 02531 DAD DB, 2:20-cr-00017 DAD, 2:20-cr-00018 DAD, 2:20-cr-00016 DAD and 2:19-cv-02544 DAD DB. (Kastilahn, A) |