California Southern District Court
Judge:Marilyn L Huff
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:19-cv-00285
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:6212 IRS: Notice of Deficiency (Injunctive Relief from IRS Lien)
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2019
Terminated:Jul 15, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 06, 2019 1:41 AM PDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Mahana Karimi Weidler
U.S. Department Of Justice, Tax Division
contact info
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
40/30 Dental Inc.
Represented By
Joshua Maxwel
Hone Maxwell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Husam Aldairi
Represented By
Joshua Maxwel
Hone Maxwell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rawaa Attar
Represented By
Joshua Maxwel
Hone Maxwell, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
8 8 1 pgs order Judgment - Clerk Tue 07/16 8:41 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is in favor of United States of America against 40/30 Dental Inc., Husam Aldairi, Rawaa Attar. Court grants Defendant USA's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without leave to amend. (jah)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2019
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 07/16 8:29 AM
ORDER granting Defendant United States of America's5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Court grants Defendant's motion to dismiss without leave to amend. Plaintiffs may file a new complaint once they have exhausted their administrative remedies or established jurisdiction as detailed in this Order. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/15/2019. (jah)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2019
6 6 order Order ~Util - Motions Submitted Mon 06/24 10:11 AM
Minute ORDER: The Court, pursuant to its discretion under Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), determines that the motion to dismiss (Doc. No.5 ) is fit for resolution without oral argument, submits the motion on the parties' papers, and vacates the hearing on the motion set for July 1, 2019. The briefing schedule remains the same. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 6/24/2019. (no document attached) (smy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
5 5 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 06/03 3:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by United States of America.(Weidler, Mahana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proof of Service
Thursday, April 25, 2019
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/25 12:16 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant United States of America must answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/25/2019. (jah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/24 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued by United States of America. (Weidler, Mahana)Attorney Mahana Karimi Weidler added to party United States of America(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 02/08 9:32 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/08 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12177083), filed by Husam Aldairi, Rawaa Attar, 40/30 Dental Inc. The new case number is 3:19-cv-00285-H-KSC. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Maxwel, Joshua)(cdw) (jao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet