Oregon District Court
Judge:Jolie A Russo
Case #: 3:19-cv-00197
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2019
Terminated:Apr 22, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2019 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Andrew Bidema
Defendant
LEJR Construction, LLC.
Represented By
Shawna R. Meyer
Meyer Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Power Construction LLC.
Defendant
Stanlee Construction, LLC.
Plaintiff
Raidel Gomez Acosta
Represented By
Mayra Ledesma
Northwest Workers' Justice Project
contact info
D. Michael Dale
Law Offices Of D. Michael Dale
contact info
Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Northwest Workers' Justice Project
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Puig-Perez
Represented By
Mayra Ledesma
Northwest Workers' Justice Project
contact info
D. Michael Dale
Law Offices Of D. Michael Dale
contact info
Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Northwest Workers' Justice Project
contact info

GPO May 22 2020
A. Russo. (gm)ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 41 is Granted in Part, in that plaintiffs are awarded a total of $19,083.10 in attorney fees and $715 in costs. Signed on 5/22/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 22, 2020
44 44 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 05/22 11:49 AM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs41 is Granted in Part, in that plaintiffs are awarded a total of $19,083.10 in attorney fees and $715 in costs. Signed on 5/22/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
43 43 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 05/06 4:54 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs41 on the under advisement calendar of 6/8/2020. (gm)
Related: [-]
42 42 oth_sup Declaration Wed 05/06 4:37 PM
Declaration of Mayra Ledesma in suppport of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion for Attorney Fees41 .
Att: 1 Exhibit ML Resume,
Att: 2 Exhibit ML Hours Claimed,
Att: 3 Exhibit CSS Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit Notices to Bidema and Stanlee,
Att: 5 Exhibit CSS Hours Claimed,
Att: 6 Exhibit DMD Resume,
Att: 7 Exhibit DMD Hours,
Att: 8 Exhibit NWJP Costs
41 41 motion Attorney Fees Wed 05/06 4:26 PM
Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2020
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 04/22 4:42 PM
Default Judgment - The Court orders that judgment is entered in favor of: (1) Plaintiff Jorge Puig-Perez and against Defendants Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction, LLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of $11,047.98; (2) Plaintiff Jorge Puig-Perez and against Defendants Andrew Bidema for an additional amount of $4,051.52; (3) Plaintiff Raidel Gomez and against Defendants Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction, LLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of $11,047.98; and (4) Plaintiff Raidel Gomez and against Defendants Andrew Bidema for an additional amount of $4,051.52. Signed 4/22/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
Related: [-]
39 39 order Dismissal - Party Wed 04/22 1:39 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT POWER CONSTRUCTION LLC (ONLY): It is Ordered that Plaintiff's Motion to (Voluntarily) Dismiss Defendant Power Construction LLC38 is Granted and that this action as to Defendant Power Construction LLC (only) is Dismissed without prejudice. Pending motions as to this defendant, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 4/22/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2020
38 38 motion Dismiss Tue 04/21 5:08 PM
Motion to Dismiss Defendant Power Construction, LLC without Prejudice . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
37 37 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/21 3:53 PM
Declaration of Raidel Gomez Acosta . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion for default judgment33 .
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Text Messages
36 36 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/21 3:51 PM
Declaration of Jorge Puig-Perez . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion for default judgment33 .
35 35 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/21 3:48 PM
Declaration of Jose I. Mejia Garcia . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion for default judgment33 .
34 34 oth_sup Declaration Tue 04/21 3:47 PM
Declaration of Mayra Ledesma in support of its Motion for Default Judgment against Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction, LLC . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion for default judgment33 .
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Unpaid OT LEJR Period,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Unpaid K Wages Stanlee Period,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Summary of Damages,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Notice of Claims to Andrew and Confirmation,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Notice of Claims to Stanlee and Confirmation,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Screenshot of Stanlee Website
33 33 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/21 3:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction, LLC . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
32 32 order 1 - Scheduling Tue 04/07 11:39 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Order to File a Motion for Default Judgment (construed as a motion for extension of time)30 . By 4/28/2020, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment as to Defendants Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction LLC along with a proposed form of default judgment for review by a U.S. District Judge. (gm)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2020
31 31 oth_sup Declaration Mon 04/06 6:02 PM
Declaration of Mayra Ledesma in support of its Motion to Stay Order . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-] Motion - Miscellaneous30 .
30 30 motion Motion - Miscellaneous Mon 04/06 6:01 PM
Motion to Stay Order that Plaintiffs file a Motion for Default Judgment against Andrew Bidema, Stanlee Construction, LLC, and Power Construction, LLC . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2020
29 29 order 1 - Scheduling Fri 02/07 4:57 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Within 60 days, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment as to Defendants Andrew Bidema and Stanlee Construction LLC along with a proposed form of default judgment for review by a U.S. District Judge. (gm)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Dismissal - Party Fri 02/07 3:26 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT LEJR CONSTRUCTION LLC (ONLY): It is Ordered that the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant LEJR Construction LLC27 is Granted and that this action as to Defendant LEJR Construction LLC (only) is Dismissed with prejudice and without payment of costs to any party. Pending motions as to this defendant, if any, are Denied as Moot. Signed on 2/7/20 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Dismiss Fri 02/07 12:29 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss LEJR Construction LLC with Prejudice . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
26 26 oth_doc Joint Status Report Fri 02/07 12:21 PM
Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
25 25 order Order on Motion for Stay Thu 11/21 2:42 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting in Part Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines and to Request Status Conference23 . The case management deadlines are Stayed and the parties shall file a formal Joint Status Report no later than 2/11/2020. The court will determine if a telephonic status conference will be necessary once the report is filed. (gm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
24 24 oth_sup Declaration Mon 11/18 2:34 PM
Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich ISO Motion to Stay All Deadlines and To Request Status Conference . Filed by All Plaintiffs. Related [+] (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna)
Related: [-] Motion for Stay23 .
23 23 motion Stay Mon 11/18 2:33 PM
Motion for Stay All Deadline and To Request Status Conference . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
22 22 minute Scheduling Conference Mon 08/05 2:17 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 8/5/19. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery is to be completed by 11/22/2019. Written consents, if any, should be submitted by 11/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/21/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/23/2020 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. Mayra Ledesma; Corinna Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Shawna Meyer present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
21 21 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 07/10 10:19 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 8/5/2019 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
20 20 notice Address Change Wed 07/03 10:02 AM
Notice of Change of Address. Shawna Meyer/Meyer Law Group Filed by LEJR Construction, LLC.. (Meyer, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 5:30 PM
First Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by LEJR Construction, LLC.. (Meyer, Shawna)
Related: [-]
18 18 order 1 - Scheduling Mon 07/01 11:54 AM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Order ( 13 )16 . This order is Stayed until final judgment is entered against the remaining party Defendant LEJR Construction LLC. (gm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2019
17 17 oth_sup Declaration Thu 06/27 3:30 PM
Declaration of Mayra Ledesma in suppport of Plaintiffs' motion to stay the order that Plaintiffs' file a motion for default judgment against defaulted defendants . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stay Thu 06/27 3:28 PM
Motion for Stay the order that Plaintiffs' file a motion for default judgment against defaulted defendants . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Thu 06/13 12:18 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant LEJR Construction's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time14 as follows and as modified: Answer deadline reset to 7/1/2019 for Defendant LEJR Construction LLC. Counsel are reminded to include the word "UNOPPOSED" in the caption of the motion pleading as required by Local Rule 7-1(a)(4) if the other parties to the action do not oppose the motion. (gm)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition Thu 06/13 12:08 PM
First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by LEJR Construction, LLC.. (Meyer, Shawna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Supporting Declaration
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
13 13 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Wed 06/05 5:14 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default9 against Defendants Andrew Bidema, Stanlee Construction LLC, and Power Construction LLC. Within 30 days, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for default judgment as to these three defendants along with a proposed form of default judgment for review by a U.S. District Judge. (gm)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 06/05 2:49 PM
ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time10 as follows: Discovery is to be completed by 9/9/2019. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/9/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/9/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/9/2019 or until 30 days after this Court's final ruling on dispositive motions, whichever date is later. (gm)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_sup Declaration Wed 06/05 1:38 PM
Declaration of Mayra Ledesma in support of Motion to Extend Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines Wed 06/05 1:36 PM
Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Default Entry Wed 06/05 1:34 PM
Motion for Entry of Default against Andrew Bidema, Stanlee Construction, Power Construction . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/08 5:44 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Andrew Bidema served on 5/8/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service & Email from Process Server Steven Jensen,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email to Attorney Jaime Kilberg,
Att: 3 Exhibit Request for Change of Address Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit Cover Letter to BOLI,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proof of Mailing re BOLI Packet,
Att: 6 Exhibit Notice Letter to Andrew Bidema,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proof of Mailing re Notice to 348 NE Williams Rd,
Att: 8 Exhibit Proof of Mailing re Notice to 5505 SE 46th
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 05/08 5:35 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Power Construction LLC. served on 5/8/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Non-Service for Power Construction LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cover Letter to SOS & POS,
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice to Power Construction of Service to SOS & BOLI,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of Mailing Notice to Power Construction LLC,
Att: 5 Exhibit Cover Letter to BOLI
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/24 1:49 PM
Affidavit of Service upon Stanlee Construction, LLC. served on 4/8/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
5 5 service Waiver of Service Summons Fri 03/29 11:43 AM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed 3/20/19 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Letter of Representation for LEJR
Thursday, March 21, 2019
4 4 service Waiver of Service Summons Thu 03/21 1:55 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by LEJR Construction, LLC. waiver sent on 2/11/2019. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/11 1:48 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Andrew Bidema, LEJR Construction, LLC., Power Construction LLC., Stanlee Construction, LLC.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 02/11 1:41 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 08, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/08 10:53 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5731624 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jorge Puig-Perez, Raidel Gomez Acosta against All Defendants. (Ledesma, Mayra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Andrew Bidema,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons LEJR Construction LLC,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Stanlee Construction LLC,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Power Construction LLC