Barrios v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Federico A Moreno |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-20534 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Jan 13, 2020 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2019 4:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carnival Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Frank J. Allocca
Florida Mediation Group 44 West Flagler Street 19th Floor
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
Plaintiff
Luis Barrios
2050 West Dunlap Avenue - No. 55
Phoenix, AR 85021 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 21, 2021 | ||
68 | 68
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 07/22 9:41 AM
ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA for want of prosecution because the appellant Luis Barrios has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules re47 Notice of Appeal, filed by Luis Barrios. USCA 19-13621 GG. (apz) |