New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00035
Case Filed:Jan 11, 2019
Terminated:Sep 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 10, 2019 2:20 AM EST
Defendant
ANTHONY GARVIN (1)
Represented By
MURDOCH WALKER, II
Lowther, Walker
contact info
FRANK A. RUBINO
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
CAROL GILLEN
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
DAVID MICHAEL GARVIN
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
DAVID WILLIAM FEDER
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
ZACH INTRATER
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 25 2024
OPINION as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/25/24. (cm, )

Docket last updated: 01/06/2025 8:59 PM EST
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
1 1 23 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT as to CHRISTOPHER GOODSON (1), and ANTHONY GARVIN (2). (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs Order to Seal Case as to CHRISTOPHER GOODSON, ANTHONY GARVIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/15/2017. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
Arrest of ANTHONY GARVIN (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre:Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY GARVIN held on 11/16/2017, Defendant Advised of Rights, Financial Affidavit Executed, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to ANTHONY GARVIN held on 11/16/2017, AFPD Appointed, Bail Hearing as to ANTHONY GARVIN held on 11/16/2017, and Bail set at $250,000 Unsecured with Additional Conditions. (CD #ECR - 3:52.) (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to ANTHONY GARVIN. CAROL GILLEN for ANTHONY GARVIN appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/16/2017. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by ANTHONY GARVIN (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY GARVIN (2) $250,000 Unsecured with Additional Conditions.(Finance notified) Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/16/2017. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to ANTHONY GARVIN in amount of $ $250,000 Unsecured with Additional Conditions. (kd) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/21/2017) (kd). [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 11/16/2017 until 1/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 11/16/2017. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
19 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: DAVID MICHAEL GARVIN appearing for ANTHONY GARVIN Attorney CAROL GILLEN terminated. (GARVIN, DAVID) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2017
20 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion of David M. Garvin to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant Anthony Garvin by David M. Garvin. by ANTHONY GARVIN. (GARVIN, DAVID) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
21 21 ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. DAVID MICHAEL GARVIN withdrawn from case as to ANTHONY GARVIN (2). Defendant Anthony Garvin is to appear by new counsel on or before January 19, 2018.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/8/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
22 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FRANK A. RUBINO appearing for ANTHONY GARVIN (RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
24 24 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 1/26/2018 until 3/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/26/2018. (kd) (kd). [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 17, 2018
25 25 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by ANTHONY GARVIN. (RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
26 26 2 pgs PETITION FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE. Bail Violation Hearing is set for 2/28/2018 at 12:30 pm in Newark - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER on PETITION FOR ACTION ON CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE as to ANTHONY GARVIN. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/23/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
28 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre:Violation Hearing and Bail Hearing as to ANTHONY GARVIN held on 2/28/2018, and Order Modifying Bail Executed. (CD #ECR - 12:59.) (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs ORDER Modifying Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY GARVIN.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/28/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
31 31 MOTION Invocation of Right to have Case Submitted to Grand Jury by ANTHONY GARVIN. (RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
32 32 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 4/2/2018 until 5/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/2/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
33 33 MOTION To Allow Defendant to Dispose of Real Property Located at 13 Skyline Dr., Jersey City, NJ 07305 by ANTHONY GARVIN.(RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter to AUSA Feder and Intrater,
Att: 2 Exhibit Financial Analysis
Monday, April 23, 2018
34 34 Supplemental MOTION Supplement to Motion re33 MOTION To Allow Defendant to Dispose of Real Property Located at 13 Skyline Dr., Jersey City, NJ 07305 by ANTHONY GARVIN. (RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
35 35 RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to ANTHONY GARVIN re34 Supplemental MOTION Supplement to Motion re33 MOTION To Allow Defendant to Dispose of Real Property Located at 13 Skyline Dr., Jersey City, NJ 07305 ,33 MOTION To Allow Defendant to Dispose of Real Property Located at 13 Skyline Dr., Jersey City, NJ 07305 (INTRATER, ZACH) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
36 36 LETTER ORDER as to ANTHONY GARVIN - Defendant's counsel shall prepare and submit a proposed Consent Order in a form approved by the Government.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/7/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
37 37 2 pgs ORDER granting33 Motion as to ANTHONY GARVIN (2); and granting34 Motion as to ANTHONY GARVIN (2).Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/9/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
38 38 AMENDED ORDER as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 5/22/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
40 40 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 6/13/2018 until 7/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 6/13/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2018
41 41 First MOTION for Leave to Appear sponsor (pro hac vice) Robert J. De Groot Attorney: Motion to sponsor Murdoch Walker, pro hac vice. by ANTHONY GARVIN.(DEGROOT, ROBERT) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 sample order
Monday, July 16, 2018
42 42 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: MURDOCH WALKER, II appearing for ANTHONY GARVIN Attorney FRANK A. RUBINO terminated. (kd) Modified on 7/25/2018 (sms, ) [Clerk's Note: Attorney Frank A. Rubino has been unterminated- as per request from Counsel]. [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
43 43 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 7/26/2018 until 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 7/26/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
44 44 2 pgs CONSENT ORDER to Modifying Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/17/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 21, 2018
45 45 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY GARVIN. Time excluded from 8/21/2018 until 12/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 8/21/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 24, 2018
46 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FRANK A. RUBINO. by ANTHONY GARVIN.(RUBINO, FRANK) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
47 47 ORDER granting46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. FRANK A. RUBINO withdrawn from case. as to ANTHONY GARVIN (2)Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/5/2018. (kd) [2:17-mj-08179-LDW]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to ANTHONY GARVIN [Newark - Judge Katharine S. Hayden] (msd)
Related: [-]
48 48 INDICTMENT as to ANTHONY GARVIN (1) counts 1, 2. (msd)
Related: [-]