Riling et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45056 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 11, 2019 |
Case in other court: | West Virginia Southern, 2:18-cv-01390 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:10 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
A. P. Riling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrew G. Riling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Riling
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 5:46 PM EDT |
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | ||
1 | 1 58 pgs COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-6903737. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, A. P. Riling, for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re:1 Complaint. (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons submitted as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons submitted as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons submitted as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons submitted as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons submitted as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Summons submitted as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons submitted as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons as to Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC | ||
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq) (Modified on 11/2/2018 to refer case to Judge Aboulhosn)(ts). [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Summons issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Summons issued as to McKesson Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons issued as to Cardinal Health, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons issued as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, | ||
Att: 6 Summons issued as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., | ||
Att: 7 Summons issued as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., | ||
Att: 8 Summons issued as to Mallinckrodt PLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons issued as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC | ||
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC. (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
6 | 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to Purdue Pharma L.P. (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
7 | 7 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/9/2018 as to McKesson Corporation. (taq) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, November 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR MCKESSON CORPORATION TO RESPOND TO1 COMPLAINT by A. P. Riling, Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, McKesson Corporation. (Mullins, Katherine) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add party filer) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO1 COMPLAINT by Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Andrew G. Riling, Beverly Riling, A. P. Riling. (Markins, Michael) (Modified on 11/30/2018 to add party filers) (kp). [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10 COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING SESSION set for 1/31/2019 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
11 | 11 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Transfer Order MDL 2804. (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
12 | 12 TRANSFER ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/SDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair of the Panel on 2/07/2019. (cc: attys) (kp) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/11/2019.] | |
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) assigned to case (P,R) | ||
13 | 13 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-01390. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |