Gibbens v. Quality Rental Tools Inc
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00288 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 19, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 3:29 AM CST |
Counter Claimant
Quality Rental Tools, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Basin Holdings US, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Robert D Gibbens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quality Rental Tools, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert D Gibbens
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Defendant
Basin Holdings LLC
Terminated: 11/19/2013
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, February 19, 2016 | ||
43 | 43
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 02/23 3:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/19/2016.(bwn) |
|
Friday, February 14, 2014 | ||
42 | 42 ORDER - All entries shall be made on the master docket sheet only, with a notation listing the cases to which the document applies, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be entered on the individual docket sheet. All documents shall be filed in the master file only, except that orders and documents terminating a party or disposing of a case will also be filed in the record of the individual case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/14/2014.(bwn) | |
Wednesday, February 12, 2014 | ||
41 | 41 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III for all further proceedings. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo, Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/11/2014.(NEF:JTM, JCW, DEK)(my, ) | |
Monday, February 10, 2014 | ||
40 | 40 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:13-cv-02891. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (jtd) | |
Thursday, February 06, 2014 | ||
DISTRICT TRANSFER OUT to Eastern District of Louisiana, Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Davenport, M) | ||
Thursday, January 23, 2014 | ||
39 | 39 ORDER granting5 Motion to Change Venue; denying15 Motion to Dismiss; denying15 Motion to Stay; granting15 Motion to Transfer Case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order be stayed until 2/3/2014 to allow an appeal to the District Judge. If no appeal is filed by 2/3/2014, the case shall then be transferred forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 1/23/2014. (crt,Davenport, M) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Wednesday, January 15, 2014 | ||
38 | 38 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: taking under advisement5 Motion to Change Venue; withdrawing11 Motion to Require Payment of Expert Witness Fee; taking under advisement15 Motion to Dismiss; taking under advisement15 Motion to Stay; taking under advisement15 Motion to Transfer Case; MOTION HEARING held on 1/15/2014 re5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc,11 MOTION Require Payment of Expert Witness Fee filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc,15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Davenport, M) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
37 | 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Change Venue ,15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Robert D Gibbens. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
36 | 36 ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 1/15/14. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Tuesday, January 14, 2014 | ||
35 | 35 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Robert D Gibbens regarding33 MOTION for Leave to File . (aty,Moroux, Jerome) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
34 | 34 NOTICE of Deficiency to Jerome Harold Moroux on behalf of Robert D Gibbens regarding33 MOTION for Leave to File. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Monday, January 13, 2014 | ||
33 | 33 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by Robert D Gibbens regarding31 Response to Motion, . (aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified event on 1/14/2014. See document31 for proposed pleading (Kennedy, T). Modified to reflect document as deficient on 1/14/2014 (Kennedy, T). Modified to remove deficiency status on 1/15/2014. See document35 Corrective Document. (Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
32 | 32 NOTICE of Deficiency to Jerome Harold Moroux on behalf of Robert D Gibbens regarding31 Response to Motion,. Reason: The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not provide for the filing of a reply brief and acceptance of such a brief is discretionary with the judge. Leave of court must be obtained before the filing of a reply brief in this case. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Jerome Harold Moroux on behalf of Robert D Gibbens regarding33 MOTION for Leave to File. Action taken: Modified event to more accurately identify the pleading submitted. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | ||
Motions Transferred regarding33 MOTION for Leave to File. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | ||
Friday, January 10, 2014 | ||
31 | 31 PROPOSED REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Change Venue ,15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Robert D Gibbens. (aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified to reflect document as deficient and modified text to more accurately identify the pleading submitted on 1/13/2014 (Kennedy, T). Modified to reflect document as proposed and remove deficiency status on 1/14/2014 (Kennedy, T). [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Wednesday, January 08, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Basin Holdings U S L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Tuesday, November 26, 2013 | ||
28 | 28 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by Robert D Gibbens. (aty,Moroux, Jerome) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
27 | 27 NOTICE of Deficiency to Jerome Harold Moroux on behalf of Robert D Gibbens regarding26 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion. Reason: This document is not accompanied by a certificate of service as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(d). (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Monday, November 25, 2013 | ||
29 | 29 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION:15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill for Report and Recommendation. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
26 | 26 DEFICIENT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by Robert D Gibbens. (aty,Moroux, Jerome) Modified to reflect document as deficient on 11/26/2013. (Kennedy, T) Modified to remove "?" from docket text on 11/27/2013. Document resubmitted in its entirety as document28 Supplemental Memorandum in Support. (Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
25 | 25 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc. (aty,Delaunay, Gerald) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Friday, November 22, 2013 | ||
24 | 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Basin Holdings U S L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
23 | 23 NOTICE of Deficiency to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of Basin Holdings U S L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C regarding22 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reason: This document is not accompanied by a certificate of service as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(d). (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
22 | 22 DEFICIENT CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Basin Holdings U S L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified on 11/22/2013 (Kennedy, T). Modified to remove "?" from docket text on 11/25/2013. Document resubmitted as document24 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Wednesday, November 20, 2013 | ||
20 | 20 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill: Telephone hearing held on 11/20/2013 re6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc. Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint. Responses due by 11/25/2013. Supplement to memorandum due by 11/25/2013. (crt,Davenport, M) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
19 | 19 ORDER Setting15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case,11 MOTION Require Payment of Expert Witness Fee,5 MOTION to Change Venue. Motion day set for 1/15/2014 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/19/2013. (crt,Davenport, M) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Tuesday, November 19, 2013 | ||
21 | 21 ORDER granting14 Motion to Enroll Jerome H Moroux as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/19/13. (crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
18 | 18 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:17 Answer to Counterclaim sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of Basin Holdings U S L L C and Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/3/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
17 | 17 ANSWER to7 Counterclaim with Jury Demand by Basin Holdings U S L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C.(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Basin Holdings L L C(pty:cd), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C(pty:cd))(aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified on 11/19/2013 to correctly identify document and correct filer (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Monday, November 18, 2013 | ||
16 | 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding15 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Rebecca F Doherty. Motion day set for 1/24/2014 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Friday, November 15, 2013 | ||
15 | 15 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Proceeding by Quality Rental Tools Inc.(aty,Delaunay, Gerald). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case on 11/18/2013 (Dauterive, C). [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed order | ||
Wednesday, November 13, 2013 | ||
14 | 14 MOTION for Jerome H. Moroux to Enroll as Counsel by Robert D Gibbens. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(Attorney Jerome Harold Moroux added to party Robert D Gibbens(pty:pla))(aty,Moroux, Jerome) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Text of proposed order | ||
Thursday, November 07, 2013 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE HEARING - A telephone hearing on the6 MOTION to Redact or Seal1 Complaint will be conducted before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on November 19, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Movant shall initiate the conference call. Motion day set for 11/19/2013 10:00 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/07/13. (crt,Guidry, C) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding:11 MOTION Require Payment of Expert Witness Fee . Motion day set for 12/18/2013 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Wednesday, November 06, 2013 | ||
11 | 11 WITHDRAWN MOTION Require Payment of Expert Witness Fee by Quality Rental Tools Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) Modified on 1/15/2014 to withdraw (Davenport, M). [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed order | ||
Monday, November 04, 2013 | ||
10 | 10 MINUTE ENTRY REFERRING MOTION:6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, filed by Quality Rental Tools Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Friday, November 01, 2013 | ||
9 | 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Basin Holdings L L C, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals L L C, Robert D Gibbens (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding:5 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion day set for 12/18/2013 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Thursday, October 31, 2013 | ||
7 | 7 ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Robert D Gibbens, Basin Holdings, LLC, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals, LLC by Quality Rental Tools Inc.(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
6 | 6 MOTION to Seal Document1 Complaint, by Quality Rental Tools Inc.(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed order | ||
5 | 5 MOTION to Change Venue by Quality Rental Tools Inc. Motions referred to C Michael Hill.(Attorney Gerald C Delaunay added to party Quality Rental Tools Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Delaunay, Gerald) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed order | ||
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Basin Holdings, LLC, Black Diamond Oilfield Rentals, LLC, Robert D Gibbens, requested by Quality Rental Tools Inc. (aty,Delaunay, Gerald) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | ||
Tuesday, October 22, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quality Rental Tools Inc (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Friday, October 18, 2013 | ||
3 | 3 EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, Exhibit B Quality Tools letter to Marjorie Corcoran by Robert D Gibbens. (aty,Young, Adam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
2 | 2 EXHIBIT re1 Complaint, Exhibit A, Employment Contract by Robert D Gibbens. (aty,Young, Adam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Quality Rental Tools Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-2364439) filed by Robert D Gibbens.(Attorney Adam G Young added to party Robert D Gibbens(pty:pla))(aty,Young, Adam) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill. (crt,Kennedy, T) [Transferred from lawd on 2/10/2014.] |