North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Case #: 7:19-cv-00023
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2019
Terminated:Aug 26, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Aug 10, 2019 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
Matthew Scott Griffin
PO Box 77
Wrightsville Beach, NC 28480
Plaintiff
SunTrust Bank
Represented By
D. Kyle Deak
Troutman Sanders, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2019
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/26 12:54 PM
Order Dismissing Case without prejudice - Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/26/2019. Sent to Matthew Scott Griffin at PO Box 77 Wrightsville Beach, NC 28480 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 08/26 9:23 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding18 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 41 filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 08/26 9:22 AM
MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 41 filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, May 06, 2019
17 17 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Mon 05/06 4:36 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Matthew Scott Griffin. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Bankruptcy Case Filing
Friday, April 26, 2019
16 16 1 pgs discov Order for Discovery Plan Fri 04/26 9:40 AM
ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/26/2019. Sent to Matthew Scott Griffin at PO Box 77 Wrightsville Beach, NC 28480 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice-other Fri 04/26 9:37 AM
Notice to pro se defendant regarding 14 Order on Motion to Strike, 13 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. Sent to Matthew Scott Griffin at PO Box 77 Wrightsville Beach, NC 28480 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2019
14 14 order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 04/25 5:49 PM
ORDER denying9 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/25/2019. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Thu 04/25 5:49 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/25/2019. (Hayes, Lyndsay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
utility Motion Submitted Wed 04/24 8:22 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding9 MOTION to Strike8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/23 10:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding7 MOTION for Entry of Default ,9 MOTION to Strike8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email correspondence with Mr. Griffin
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/09 4:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding7 MOTION for Entry of Default,9 MOTION to Strike8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Matthew Scott Griffin. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
10 10 5 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 04/02 9:52 AM
Memorandum in Support regarding9 MOTION to Strike8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Strike Tue 04/02 9:51 AM
MOTION to Strike8 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Striking Answer
utility Motion Submitted Tue 04/02 9:20 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding7 MOTION for Entry of Default. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 03/14 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Matthew Scott Griffin. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2019
7 7 motion Entry of Default Fri 03/08 4:15 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default
Monday, February 25, 2019
6 6 4 pgs notice Notice-other Mon 02/25 4:51 PM
Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet filed by Matthew Scott Griffin. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/25 4:22 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by D. Kyle Deak on behalf of SunTrust Bank. (Deak, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 13, 2019
4 4 notice Notice-other Wed 02/13 9:15 AM
Notice regarding1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel D. Kyle Deak of Troutman Sanders LLP at 305 Church at North Hills Street, Suite 1200, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on February 13, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 02/13 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding1 Notice of Removal: The defendant has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rle 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website. A copy of this notice mailed via US mail to Matthew Scott Griffin at PO Box 77, Wrightsville Beach, NC 28480. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
3 3 2 pgs misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 02/12 4:03 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Matthew Scott Griffin. (Grady, B.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Self-Representation Tue 02/12 4:03 PM
Notice of Self-Representation filed by Matthew Scott Griffin. (Grady, B.)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/12 4:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Matthew Scott Griffin from New Hanover County Superior Court, case number 19CVS000206. (Filing fee $400, receipt number WIL001963). (Grady, B.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 35 pgs State Court Documents,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet