Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:19-cv-00242
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 12, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Aug 11, 2019 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Mulvey
Represented By
Jessica S. Davis
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Boyer
Represented By
Barry H. Dyller
Law Office Of Barry H. Dyller
contact info
Matthew L. Clemente
Gettysburg House
contact info
Plaintiff
Tamra Smith
Represented By
Barry H. Dyller
Law Office Of Barry H. Dyller
contact info
Matthew L. Clemente
Gettysburg House
contact info

GPO Jul 12 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 7/12/24. (dj)
GPO Mar 18 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 104 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Robert Boyer, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Mulvey Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/18/2025. (cw)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
134 134 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 04/14 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in Non-Prisoner Case as to126 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry),127 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by Michael Mulvey. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAMDC-6961882. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Boland, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
133 133 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/09 2:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 5/2/2025 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab. TIME CHANGE ONLY Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 4/9/25. (ae)
Related: [-]