Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joshua D Wolson
Case #: 2:19-cv-00612
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2019
Terminated:Jun 01, 2022
Last checked: Monday Aug 12, 2019 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
RADNOR TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By
MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
MARY J. PEDERSEN
Wisler Pearlstine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTHER PURNELL
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER J. DELGAIZO
Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
KENNETH E. BATCHELOR
Terminated: 04/12/2019
Represented By
MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
MARY J. PEDERSEN
Wisler Pearlstine LLP
contact info
Defendant
MAUREEN A. MCQUIGGAN, Ed.D
Terminated: 04/12/2019
Represented By
MICHAEL D. KRISTOFCO
Wisler Pearlstine, LLP
contact info
MARY J. PEDERSEN
Wisler Pearlstine LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 12 2019
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/12/19. 4/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(va, )
GPO Apr 12 2019
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3 DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AS DETAILED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/12/19. 4/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
GPO Jun 12 2020
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 06/12/2020. 06/12/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
GPO Jun 12 2020
ORDER THAT 25 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 56, SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT RADNOR TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT ON COUNTS I, II, AND VI, AS WELL AS THOSE PORTIONS OF COUNT V ALLEGING DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF RACE, SEX, OR AGE. THE MOTION IS OTHERWISE DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 06/12/2020. 06/12/2020 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
GPO Jun 01 2022
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 6/1/22. 6/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
GPO Jun 01 2022
ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF ESTHER PURNELL AND AGAINST DEFENDANT RADNOR TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT IN THE AMOUNT OF $338,738.44. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 6/1/22. 6/1/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
GPO Jul 14 2022
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/14/2022. 7/14/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)
GPO Jul 14 2022
ORDER GRANTING 67 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE JUNE 1, 2022 CIVIL JUDGMENT OF THE COURT, FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH IN THE COURT'S ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM. IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED THAT THE COURT'S PRIOR CIVIL JUDGMENT 64 IS AMENDED, AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF ESTHER PURNELL AND AGAINST DEFENDANT RADNOR TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT IN THE AMOUNT OF $362,379.11. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/14/2022. 7/14/2022 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
82 82 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Wed 09/07 1:03 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT with Certificate of Service by ESTHER PURNELL. (DELGAIZO, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]