California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Referred: Kandis A Westmore
Case #: 3:19-cv-00792
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2019
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 16, 2019 10:02 AM PDT
Defendant
World Financial Group Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By
Spencer C. Skeen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak Stewart PC
contact info
Jesse Carter Ferrantella
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Timothy Lloyd Johnson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Marlene Moffitt
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Defendant
World Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By
Spencer C. Skeen
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak Stewart PC
contact info
Jesse Carter Ferrantella
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Timothy Lloyd Johnson
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Marlene Moffitt
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ismail Chraibi
Represented By
Chad F. Edwards
Rosenberg, Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Stanley D Saltzman
Marlin And Saltzman LLP
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
David Rosenberg
Rosenberg Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorothy Jenkins
Represented By
Chad F. Edwards
Rosenberg, Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Stanley D Saltzman
Marlin And Saltzman LLP
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
David Rosenberg
Rosenberg Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Jenkins
Represented By
Chad F. Edwards
Rosenberg, Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Stanley D Saltzman
Marlin And Saltzman LLP
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
David Rosenberg
Rosenberg Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tricia Yeomans
Represented By
Stanley D Saltzman
Marlin And Saltzman LLP
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Fatemeh Abtahi
Represented By
Chad F. Edwards
Rosenberg, Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
David Rosenberg
Rosenberg Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Cameron Bradford
Represented By
Chad F. Edwards
Rosenberg, Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info
David Rosenberg
Rosenberg Shpall And Zeigen, Aplc
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Rodriguez
Represented By
Stanley D Saltzman
Marlin And Saltzman LLP
contact info
Stanley Donald Saltzman
Marlin & Saltzman
contact info
Christina Marie Lucio
Farnaes And Lucio, Apc
contact info
Adam Tamburelli
Marlin And Saltzman, LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 06 2019
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 24 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
GPO Sep 11 2020
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 73 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2020)
GPO Mar 19 2021
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 89 Defendants' Motion to Stay. Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
GPO Apr 21 2021
ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 99 Discovery Letter Brief. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
GPO Mar 22 2022
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 119 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Amended Complaint due by 4/21/2022. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022)

Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
164 164 misc Received Document Fri 08/23 8:16 AM
Received Document: San Francisco Superior Return Confirmation of Receipt of163 Clerk's Notice Re: Remand. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]