Massachusetts District Court
Judge:F Dennis Saylor, IV
Case #: 1:19-cv-10290
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 13, 2019 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
XPO Last Mile, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin R. Davis
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Adam L. Lounsbury
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramon Gonzalez
Represented By
Hilary Schwab
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Steve Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Stephen S. Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Rachel J. Smit
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Addelyn Marte
Represented By
Hilary Schwab
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Steve Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Stephen S. Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Rachel J. Smit
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rodriguez Ortiz
Represented By
Hilary Schwab
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Steve Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Stephen S. Churchill
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info
Rachel J. Smit
Fair Work, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2022
District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER AND MEMORANDUM entered granting 56 Motion to Certify Class. (Castles, Martin)
GPO Aug 07 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT.For the foregoing reasons, (1) the motion for summary judgment of defendant RXO Last Mile, Inc. (Dkt. No. 129) and (2) the motion for partial summary judgment of plaintiffs Ramon Gonzalez, Victor Rodriguez Ortiz, and Addelyn Marte, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, (Dkt. No. 132) are DENIED.So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)
GPO Aug 07 2024
Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON DEFENDANT'SMOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASS.For the foregoing reasons, the motion for class decertification of defendant RXO Last Mile, Inc. (Dkt. No. 127) is DENIED.So Ordered. (de Oliveira, Flaviana)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
167 167 minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/02 2:38 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held by telephone on 4/2/2025. Case called; Status discussed; Further mediation anticipated. NOTICE OF HEARING: Status Conference set for 6/2/2025 03:00 PM by telephone before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Rachel Smit and Stephen Churchill for the plaintiff. Adam Lounsbury for the defendant.) (MMM)
Related: [-]