NH Lottery Commission v. US Attorney General et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Paul J Barbadoro |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-00163 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Feb 15, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 14, 2019 4:46 AM EDT |
Amicus
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, acting by and through, Department of Revenue, Secretary C. Daniel Hassell, and Bureau of Lottery
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Michigan Bureau of State Lottery
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
State of New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The Coalition to Stop Internet Gambling
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
The National Association of Convenience Stores
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
iDevelopment and Economic Association
1717 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Suite 650
Washington, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
US Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
US Department of Justice
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Consol Defendant
USA
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
NeoPollard Interactive LLC
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Pollard Banknote Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Attorney General
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Department of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NH Lottery Commission
NH Lottery Commission 14 Integra Drive
Concord, NH 03301 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 16, 2021 | ||
94 | 94
![]() MANDATE of USCA as to88 Notice of Appeal filed by US Department of Justice, US Attorney General, USA,93 Judgment. In accordance with the judgment of January 20, 2021, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), this constitutes the formal mandate of this Court.(js) |