New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:19-cv-00938
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2019
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 14, 2019 5:02 AM EDT
Defendant
The Central Orthopedic Group, LLP
651 Old Country Road #200
Plainview, NY 11803
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Jorge Baez, M.D.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Fernando Checo, M.D.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Jordan Kerker, M.D.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Mitchell Keschner, M.D.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Scott Silverberg, M.D.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
David Zitner, MD.
Represented By
Edumin Corrales
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford P.C.
contact info
Rebecca R. Embry
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Seema V. Nambiar, M.D.
Represented By
Frank V. Floriani
Sullivan Papain Bmc P.C
contact info
Christopher John DelliCarpini
Sullivan Papain Block Mcgrath & Cannavo P.C.
contact info

GPO Apr 21 2020
ORDER denying 24: See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/21/2020. c/ecf (Miller, Dina)
GPO Feb 01 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 53, 57: See the attached Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/1/2024. c/ecf (RI)
GPO Mar 26 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration re 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendation as to 66 Report and Recommendation. For the stated reasons, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections (ECF No. 67) are OVERRULED, the R&R (ECF No. 66) is ADOPTED in its entirety, and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 53) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motions: (1) to strike; and (2) for reconsideration (ECF No. 57) are DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's breach of contract claim. After judgment is entered in favor of Defendants, the Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/26/2024. (CV)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
appeal Electronic Index to Record on Appeal Wed 04/24 10:43 AM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.72 Notice of Appeal, Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (DC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Wed 04/24 1:29 PM
ORDER granting71 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Pankaj Malik added. Attorney Christopher John DelliCarpini and Frank V. Floriani terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/24/2024. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
72 72 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 04/23 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to69 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations,,,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,,70 Clerk's Judgment,, by Seema V. Nambiar, MD. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANYEDC-17802258. (Malik, Pankaj)
Related: [-]
71 71 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 04/23 1:57 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Seema V. Nambiar, MD. (Malik, Pankaj)
Related: [-]