City of Preston v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45067 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 14, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Idaho, 4:19-cv-00031 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:12 PM EST |
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Masters Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International PLC
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Preston
Mooney Wieland 405 S. 8th Street, Suite 295
Boise, ID 83702 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/20/2019 4:43 PM EST |
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 122 pgs COMPLAINT against City of Preston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1839268.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wieland, Steven) [Transferred from idd on 2/14/2019.] | |
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint filed by City of Preston, Mallinckrodt, LLC. (Wieland, Steven) [Transferred from idd on 2/14/2019.] | |
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division and case reassigned to Judge David C. Nye. Please use case number 4:19-cv-00031-DCN for all future filings. (cjs) [Transferred from idd on 2/14/2019.] | ||
Thursday, February 14, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 ORDER- CTO-79 by the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re MDL No.2804.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) [Transferred from idd on 2/14/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019) | |
Att: 1 Text Only Entry Minute Order | ||
4 | 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO MDL PANEL for Northern District of Ohio re CTO-79 for MDL No. 2804. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) [Transferred from idd on 2/14/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019) | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Idaho. Case number 4:19-cv-00031. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |