Collective Licensing International, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kathy A Surratt-States |
Case #: | 4:19-bk-40891 |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Collective Licensing International, LLC
3231 SE 6th Ave
Topeka, KS 66607-2260 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 19, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/19/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2020 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Final Decree . (jer, j) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order Granting(1913 Application to / Reorganized Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Administrative Consolidation of Claims Registers in Certain Jointly Administered Chapter 11 Cases, (II) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases, and (III) Granting Rel filed by Debtor Payless Holdings LLC) . (jer, j) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 03/17 10:24 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jer, j) |
||
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (bai, j) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Equity Security Holders , Statement of Corporate Ownership , Declaration re: List of Equity Security Holders and Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Collective Licensing International, LLC. (Edelman, Erin) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Tue 02/19 7:43 AM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case. (cru, s) |
||
Monday, February 18, 2019 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/18 10:39 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-40891 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 15803113, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Collective Licensing International, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/4/2019.Schedule A/B due 3/4/2019. Schedule C due 3/4/2019. Schedule D due 3/4/2019.Schedule E/F due 3/4/2019. Schedule G due 3/4/2019. Schedule H due 3/4/2019. Schedule I due 3/4/2019. Schedule J due 3/4/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 3/4/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/4/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 3/4/2019. Credit Counseling Date: 3/4/2019. (Engel, Richard) |