Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:19-bk-40896
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Payless ShoeSource Worldwide, Inc.
3231 SE 6th Ave
Topeka, KS 66607-2260
Represented By
John G. Willard
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Monday, September 11, 2023
5 5 order Final Decree Mon 09/11 9:52 AM
Final Decree . (Cow, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 09/11 10:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Cow, J)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2019
4 4 misc Creditor Request for Notices Sun 09/01 6:24 AM
Creditor Request for Notices Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management LLC. (Smith, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 11 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 02/20 4:00 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (bai, j)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
court Case Assigned Tue 02/19 7:43 AM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case. (cru, s)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/18 10:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-40896 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 15803154, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 39 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Mon 02/18 10:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Payless ShoeSource Worldwide, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/4/2019.Schedule A/B due 3/4/2019. Schedule C due 3/4/2019. Schedule D due 3/4/2019.Schedule E/F due 3/4/2019. Schedule G due 3/4/2019. Schedule H due 3/4/2019. Schedule I due 3/4/2019. Schedule J due 3/4/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 3/4/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/4/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 3/4/2019. Credit Counseling Date: 3/4/2019. (Willard, John)
Related: [-]