Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 4:19-bk-40904
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:Feb 22, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Collective Brands Franchising Services, LLC
3231 SE 6th Ave
Topeka, KS 66607-2260
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Friday, February 22, 2019
5 5 order Dismiss Case Order Fri 02/22 9:01 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case Related [+] . (bai, j)
Related: [-] 3
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 02/22 9:02 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (bai, j)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
4 4 11 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 02/20 4:08 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (bai, j)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss Case Wed 02/20 2:50 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by Debtor Collective Brands Franchising Services, LLC (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
court Case Assigned Tue 02/19 7:43 AM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case. (cru, s)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/18 11:06 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-40904 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 15803176, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 39 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Mon 02/18 11:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Collective Brands Franchising Services, LLC Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/4/2019.Schedule A/B due 3/4/2019. Schedule C due 3/4/2019. Schedule D due 3/4/2019.Schedule E/F due 3/4/2019. Schedule G due 3/4/2019. Schedule H due 3/4/2019. Schedule I due 3/4/2019. Schedule J due 3/4/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 3/4/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/4/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 3/4/2019. Credit Counseling Date: 3/4/2019. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]