Member Case
Lead case is: 4:19-bk-40883

Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kathy A Surratt-States
Case #: 4:19-bk-40910
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2019
Terminated:Mar 17, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Collective Brands Services, Inc.
3231 SE 6th Ave
Topeka, KS 66607-2260
Represented By
Richard W. Engel, Jr.
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, March 19, 2020
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/19 11:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/19/2020. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 17, 2020
5 5 order Final Decree Tue 03/17 3:46 PM
Final Decree . (jer, j)
Related: [-]
4 4 8 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 03/17 3:46 PM
Order Granting(1913 Application to / Reorganized Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Administrative Consolidation of Claims Registers in Certain Jointly Administered Chapter 11 Cases, (II) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases, and (III) Granting Rel filed by Debtor Payless Holdings LLC) . (jer, j)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 03/17 3:47 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (jer, j)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 11 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 02/20 4:13 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration. (bai, j)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
court Case Assigned Tue 02/19 7:43 AM
Judge Kathy A. Surratt-States added to case. (cru, s)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 02/18 11:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-40910 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 15803252, amount $1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 39 pgs misc Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 11) Mon 02/18 11:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual, Schedules and Statements. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Collective Brands Services, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 3/4/2019.Schedule A/B due 3/4/2019. Schedule C due 3/4/2019. Schedule D due 3/4/2019.Schedule E/F due 3/4/2019. Schedule G due 3/4/2019. Schedule H due 3/4/2019. Schedule I due 3/4/2019. Schedule J due 3/4/2019. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules due 3/4/2019. Statement of Financial Affairs due 3/4/2019. Chapter 11 Income Form 122B due 3/4/2019. Credit Counseling Date: 3/4/2019. (Engel, Richard)
Related: [-]