Utah District Court
Judge:Dee Benson
Case #: 2:19-cv-00117
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1691 Equal Credit Opportunity Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2019
Terminated:Mar 28, 2019
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2019 3:01 AM MDT
Defendant
Mountain Land Collections
Represented By
Ronald F. Price
Price Parkinson & Kerr PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnathon Madsen
Represented By
Daniel M. Baczynski
Baczynski Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Madsen
Represented By
Daniel M. Baczynski
Baczynski Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, March 28, 2019
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/28 10:31 PM
ORDER granting 8 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 3/28/19. (jlw)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Thu 03/28 2:43 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiffs Johnathon Madsen, Kimberly Madsen.(Baczynski, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 13, 2019
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 03/13 1:07 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Defendant Mountain Land Collections.(Price, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Answer - Case No. 189105764
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
6 6 misc Clerks Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Update Answer Deadline Wed 02/27 8:13 AM
CLERKS ORDER granting5 MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Mountain Land Collections answer due 3/13/2019. Signed by Anne Morgan, Chief Deputy on 2/26/2019. (mas)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/26 4:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint filed by Defendant Mountain Land Collections.(Price, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint
Thursday, February 21, 2019
4 4 misc Notice of Filing Thu 02/21 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF FILING of State Court Dockets re2 Notice of Removal.(mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Short Case History
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 notice Notice of ADR Wed 02/20 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Johnathon Madsen, Kimberly Madsen, Defendant Mountain Land Collections. (nl)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal (Atty) Wed 02/20 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 4th Judicial District Court - Utah County, case number 190400047, (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3208732) filed by Mountain Land Collections. Assigned to Judge Dee Benson (Price, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint
1 1 misc Remark - New Case Wed 02/20 3:28 PM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Dee Benson. Defendant Mountain Land Collections is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nl)
Related: [-]