Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Pitlyk
Case #: 4:19-cv-00259
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2019
Terminated:Aug 11, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 19, 2019 3:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Permalok Corporation
472 Paul Ave
St. Louis, MO 63135
Plaintiff
Bruce Weakley
8839 Ramona Avenue
St. Louis, MO 63121
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Rick Grissom
Terminated: 04/16/2019
Defendant
Linda Vidacak
Terminated: 04/16/2019
Defendant
Shane Zeeman
Terminated: 04/16/2019

GPO Feb 25 2019
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Employment Discrimination Complaer may result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice and without further notice. [A COPY OF DIRECTED FORM MAILED THIS DATE] Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/25/19. (KEK)int form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, accompanied by the necessary documents, as instructed in this order. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this ord
GPO Apr 16 2019
vice Company, 221 Bolivar Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101.A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith. 3 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/16/19. (CLA)OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs claims brought pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 and the Age Discrimination in Employment Act are DISMISSED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Rick Grissom, Linda Vidacak, and Shane Zeeman are DISMISSED from this action. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 3) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Permalok Corporation via its registered agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Ser
GPO Nov 08 2019
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 14 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/8/19. (KEK)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 12, 2021
misc Order Receipt Thu 08/12 8:20 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 44. Thu Aug 12 08:20:00 CDT 2021 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
44 44 order A Docket Text Order Wed 08/11 8:47 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL43 is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 8/11/2021. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 06, 2021
43 43 misc Stipulation Fri 08/06 2:35 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation for Dismissal by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
42 42 order Case Management Order - Amended Tue 05/11 12:22 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances... Discovery Completion due by 8/13/2021. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/27/2021. ADR Future Reference 6/1/2021. ADR Completion Deadline due by 7/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/4/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/15/2022... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/11/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
41 41 order A Docket Text Order Tue 05/11 12:13 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:39 MOTION for Relief From Mediation Obligation by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Newman, Samuel) filed by Permalok Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. All ADR deadlines laid out in doc36 are VACATED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/11/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
40 40 order A Docket Text Order Tue 05/11 12:12 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:38 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct37 Case Management Order - Amended, by Defendant Permalok Corporation.(Newman, Samuel) filed by Permalok Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Amended CMO to issue. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 05/11/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/11 12:23 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 40, 41, 42. Tue May 11 12:23:31 CDT 2021 (Petri, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
39 39 motion Relief Mon 05/10 2:25 PM
MOTION for Relief From Mediation Obligation by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 05, 2021
38 38 motion Amend/Correct Wed 05/05 11:32 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct37 Case Management Order - Amended, by Defendant Permalok Corporation.(Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Second Amended Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan
Monday, April 19, 2021
37 37 order Case Management Order - Amended Mon 04/19 10:34 AM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Jury Trial set for 2/1/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pretrial Compliance due by 1/12/2022. Motion in Limine due by 1/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/19/2021. (NEP)
Related: [-]
36 36 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 04/19 9:56 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Burton D. Garland Jr.. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/28/2021. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 6/11/2021. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 5/10/2021... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 04/19/2021. (ANP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/19 9:57 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 36. Mon Apr 19 09:57:07 CDT 2021 (Petri, Alexis)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/19 10:34 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 37. Mon Apr 19 10:34:29 CDT 2021 (Phillips, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2020
35 35 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Fri 12/18 9:09 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Permalok Corporation. Amended Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan . (Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 07, 2020
34 34 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 12/07 4:25 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc.28 ) is hereby GRANTED. The parties are to confer regarding Plaintiff's discovery responses and to devise a new joint scheduling plan for the Court's consideration, which is due no later than December 21, 2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/7/2020. (KEK)
Related: [-]
33 33 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 12/07 4:24 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:28 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Garland, Burton) filed by Permalok Corporation ; ORDERED GRANTED. The parties are to confer regarding Plaintiff's discovery responses and to devise a new joint scheduling plan for the Court's consideration, which is due no later than December 21, 2020. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/21/2020.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/7/2020. (NEP)
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 12/07 4:22 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2020 re28 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Permalok Corporation. Discussions held on the record. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Laura Esposito, Laura_Esposito@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7739) (proceedings started: 2:00) (proceedings ended: 2:33)(Deputy Clerk: NEP)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Pro Se - Broce Weakley)(Appearance for Defendant: Samuel Newman) (NEP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 12/07 4:25 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 33. Mon Dec 7 16:25:00 CST 2020 (Phillips, Nicole)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 12/07 4:26 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 34. Mon Dec 7 16:26:08 CST 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 30, 2020
misc Order Receipt Mon 11/30 2:01 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8, 9. Mon Nov 30 14:01:34 CST 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 18, 2020
31 31 misc Letter Wed 11/18 10:43 AM
Letter to Bruce Weakley from Court re: returning discovery materials. Three (3) manila envelops of discovery materials returned via mail, with letter, this date. (ANP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
30 30 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 11/09 1:47 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel (Doc.28 ) will be held by video conference technology on Monday, December 7, 2020, at 2:00 PM. Zoom information will be emailed to the hearing participants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Relief from Mediation Obligation (Doc.27 ) is GRANTED. The ADR referral will be vacated pending reinstatement after the Court's ruling on the Motion to Compel. (Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2020 02:00 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 11/09/2020. (ANP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 11/09 1:48 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 30. Mon Nov 9 13:48:02 CST 2020 (Petri, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 30, 2020
29 29 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 10/30 2:36 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Permalok Corporation.(Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
28 28 motion Compel Fri 10/30 2:33 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Relief Fri 10/30 2:32 PM
MOTION for Relief From Mediation Obligation by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2020
26 26 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 10/19 3:06 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: This case is referred to: mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Burton D. Garland Jr. ADR Completion Deadline due by 12/4/2020. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/18/2020. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 11/9/2020. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/19/2020. (KEK)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 10/19 3:06 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 26. Mon Oct 19 15:06:26 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 19, 2020
25 25 order Case Management Order Tue 05/19 3:47 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 Motion to Join Parties due by 5/22/2020. Discovery Completion due by 1/13/2021. ADR Future Reference 10/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/12/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pretrial Compliance due by 7/13/2021. Motion in Limine due by 7/19/2021. Status Conference set for 1/4/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16N - St. Louis before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 5/19/2020. (NEP)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/19 3:48 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 25. Tue May 19 15:48:02 CDT 2020 (Phillips, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 15, 2020
24 24 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Fri 05/15 9:21 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Permalok Corporation. Parent companies: Northwest Pipe Company, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Northwest Pipe Company,. (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 14, 2020
23 23 notice Electronic Notice of Noncompliance re: Disclosure of Organization Interests Certificate Thu 05/14 10:47 AM
Electronic Notice of Noncompliance - Review of this case shows the Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate has not been filed. The certificate must be filed with the Court within 5 days[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (KEK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 06, 2020
22 22 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Wed 05/06 12:39 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Permalok Corporation. . (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
21 21 misc Letter Thu 04/16 2:51 PM
Letter to Court from Bruce Weakly re:resolving the case. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2020
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/13 9:11 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Mon Apr 13 09:11:11 CDT 2020 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 04/13 9:11 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 20. Mon Apr 13 09:11:55 CDT 2020 (Luisetti, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2020
20 20 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Fri 04/10 2:28 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Rule 16 Conference re-set for 5/19/2020 01:00 PM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/8/2020. Counsel will receive an email with call in information. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 4/10/2020. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2020
19 19 order CJRA Order Tue 04/07 3:03 PM
CJRA ORDER. Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings. (EAB)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/07 3:04 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. copy sent to non-electronic party on this date. Tue Apr 7 15:04:22 CDT 2020 (Brown, Erica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 26, 2020
18 18 order Rule 16 Order Thu 03/26 4:18 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - A Telephone Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16, Fed.R.Civ.P., is set for Wednesday, April 22, 2020, at 1:30 PM in the courtroom of the undersigned, 13-South. The parties are directed to call into the conference at the scheduled time using the following call-in information: USA Toll-Free Number 888-363-4735, Access Code 3329658. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/16/2020. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/22/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/16/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 03/26/2020. (AAT)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 03/26 4:18 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 18. Thu Mar 26 16:18:39 CDT 2020 (Thompson, Alicia)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2019
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 11/22 7:43 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint, by Permalok Corporation.(Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
16 16 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 11/08 3:49 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss14 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 11/8/19. (KEK)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 11/08 3:49 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16. Fri Nov 8 15:49:42 CST 2019 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
15 15 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 11/07 5:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Case Thu 11/07 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 11/07 2:38 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel W. Newman for Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Newman, Samuel)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 11/07 2:35 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Burton D. Garland, Jr for Defendant Permalok Corporation. (Garland, Burton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/22 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bruce Weakley. Permalok Corporation served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2019
service Summons Issued Thu 10/17 1:40 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Permalok Corporation. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. THE FIRST TIME THE SUMMONS WAS ISSUED IT NEVER MADE IT TO THE MARSHALS SERVICE. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/29 10:57 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, no later than September 27, 2019, Plaintiff shall either serve Defendant or show cause why Plaintiffs cause of action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 8/29/19. (ARL)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 08/29 10:57 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 10. Thu Aug 29 10:57:28 CDT 2019 (Luisetti, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
misc NextGen Remark Tue 05/21 2:14 PM
NOTICE: IF YOU HAVE ALREADY UPGRADED YOUR PACER ACCOUNT YOU CAN DISREGARD THIS NOTICE. IF YOU DO NOT UPGRADE YOU WILL NOT BE ABLE TO FILE IN THE SYSTEM AFTER MAY 31, 2019. PLEASE UPGRADE IMMEDIATELY. If you are using a shared account to file cases, you will need to create an individual account; instructions can be found at:[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Register-for-New-PACER-account.pdf.] If you already have an individual account, it will need to be upgraded; instructions can be found[LINK:https://www.moed.uscourts.gov/sites/moed/files/Upgrade-Current-PACER-Account.pdf.] If you need further assistance contact the MOED CM/ECF Help Desk at 314-244-7650 or[LINK:moedml_cmecf_help@moed.uscourts.gov] . (CSAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
service Summons Issued Wed 04/17 7:19 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Permalok Corporation. The summons was hand delivered to USM. (CLA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
9 9 1 pgs order Order of Partial Dismissal 28:1915(A) Tue 04/16 3:50 PM
ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs claims brought pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 and the Age Discrimination in Employment Act are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Rick Grissom, Linda Vidacak, and Shane Zeeman are DISMISSED from this action. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Party Shane Zeeman (Operations Manager), Rick Grissom (Plant Manager) and Linda Vidacak Related [+] terminated. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/16/19. (CLA)
Related: [-] gional HR/Plant Safety Manager
8 8 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 04/16 3:47 PM
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs claims brought pursuant to the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 and the Age Discrimination in Employment Act are DISMISSED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Rick Grissom, Linda Vidacak, and Shane Zeeman are DISMISSED from this action. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this partial dismissal would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 3) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Permalok Corporation via its registered agent, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Company, 221 Bolivar Street, Jefferson City, Missouri 65101.A separate order of partial dismissal will be entered herewith.3 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/16/19. (CLA)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/16 3:48 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Tue Apr 16 15:48:25 CDT 2019 (Abrams, Carrie)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 04/16 3:50 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Tue Apr 16 15:50:41 CDT 2019 (Abrams, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2019
7 7 misc Return Letter from Clerk Thu 03/14 3:39 PM
RETURN LETTER from clerk to Plaintiff Bruce Weakley re: Magistrate Consent Form. (CBL)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/14 1:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Permalok Corporation, Rick Grissom, Linda Vidacak, Shane Zeeman Amendment to1 Complaint filed by Bruce Weakley. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Bruce Weakley.(CBL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MCHR Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
misc Order Receipt Tue 02/26 2:57 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Tue Feb 26 14:57:30 CST 2019 (Kratzer, Katie)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
5 5 7 pgs order Memorandum & Order Tue 02/26 2:56 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts Employment Discrimination Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, accompanied by the necessary documents, as instructed in this order. Plaintiffs failure to timely comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this case, without prejudice and without further notice. [A COPY OF DIRECTED FORM MAILED THIS DATE] Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 2/25/19. (KEK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
4 4 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Thu 02/21 6:24 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Thu 02/21 9:10 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Thu 02/21 9:10 AM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Thu 02/21 10:01 AM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Feb 21 10:01:09 CST 2019 (admin,)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 20, 2019
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 02/21 9:04 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Bruce Weakley. (MFG)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/21 8:58 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bruce Weakley. (MFG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/21 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Bruce Weakley.(MFG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Filing Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet