Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:J P Stadtmueller
Case #: 2:19-cv-00288
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2019
Terminated:Oct 28, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 20, 2019 3:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Jamco Products Inc
Represented By
Nora E Gierke
Gierke Frank Noorlander LLC
contact info
Emily M Horsfield
Gierke Frank Noorlander LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dalco Metals Inc
Represented By
James M Burrows
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren Sc
contact info
Steven P Bogart
Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren Sc
contact info
Edward F Thompson
Clair Law Offices Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 28, 2019
45 45 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Mon 10/28 9:50 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/28/2019.27 and36 Parties' Motions to Restrict Documents are GRANTED.28 and37 Parties' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED as moot.44 Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal is ADOPTED; CASE DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2019
44 44 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/25 3:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Dalco Metals Inc.(Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice
Friday, October 04, 2019
43 43 minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Case No Longer Referred Fri 10/04 4:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Settlement Conference held on 10/4/2019. Parties agreed to a resolution of the case. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (djo) (no document is attached to this entry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2019
42 42 minutes Status Conference Wed 10/02 4:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Pre-Mediation Status Conference held on 10/2/2019. Case to proceed to mediation on 10/4/2019. (Tape #3:31:12 - 3:42:46 pm) (lz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/01 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pre-Mediation Status Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 03:30 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
41 41 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 9:09 PM
DECLARATION of Greg Kaganovich in Support of Jamco's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-1 Kaganovich Decl. [REDACTED],
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 Kaganovich Decl. [Unredacted],
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2 Kaganovich Decl. [REDACTED],
Att: 4 Exhibit A-2 Kaganovich Decl. [Unredacted],
Att: 5 Exhibit A-3 Kaganovich Decl. [REDACTED],
Att: 6 Exhibit A-3 Kaganovich Decl. [Unredacted],
Att: 7 Exhibit A-4 Kaganovich Decl. [Unredacted]
40 40 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 9:01 PM
DECLARATION of Kelly Callam in Support of Jamco's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Callam Decl. [REDACTED],
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Callam Decl. [Unredacted]
39 39 misc Statement of Fact Fri 09/20 8:56 PM
STATEMENT OF FACT by Jamco Products Inc in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
38 38 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 09/20 8:49 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Jamco Products Inc re37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 09/20 8:45 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Jamco Products Inc. (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Seal or Restrict Document Fri 09/20 8:42 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document to Case Participants by Jamco Products Inc.(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Jamco's Motion to Seal and Restrict Documents to Case Participants
35 35 respm Brief in Support of Motion Fri 09/20 4:55 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Dalco Metals Inc re28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix of Unpublished Authority
34 34 trial Proposed Findings of Fact Fri 09/20 4:30 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact by Dalco Metals Inc This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted Statement of Proposed Material Facts
33 33 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 4:26 PM
DECLARATION of Brad Blecker This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 4:25 PM
DECLARATION of Jason Redmon This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - March 2011 Proposal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - May 2012 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - February 2013 Email,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - October 2014 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Email with Steel Update
31 31 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 4:18 PM
DECLARATION of John Ring This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - ASTM Standards,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - SheetMetal.Me Gauge Chart,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Process Orders
30 30 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 4:14 PM
DECLARATION of William Ring This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Photo of Coils,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Photos of Products,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Price Sheets,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Blanket POs,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Invoices,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Summary of Invoices
29 29 misc Declaration Fri 09/20 4:07 PM
DECLARATION of James M. Burrows(Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jamco's Discovery Responses,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Jamco Demand Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Overview of ASTM,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - ASTM and Metal Industry,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Jamco Corporation Report
28 28 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 09/20 4:02 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Dalco Metals Inc. (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Seal or Restrict Document Fri 09/20 4:00 PM
MOTION to Restrict Document to Case Participants by Dalco Metals Inc.(Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 17, 2019
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/17 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle E Marocchi on behalf of Dalco Metals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Danielle E. Marocchi (Marocchi, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2019
25 25 misc Report Fri 08/30 9:31 AM
Report from James M. Burrows First Interim Settlement Report . This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2019
24 24 order Protective Order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 08/28 4:36 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/28/2019: ADOPTING23 Parties' Amended Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms for confidential information produced or disclosed during this matter. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2019
23 23 misc Stipulation Fri 08/23 1:30 PM
STIPULATION by Dalco Metals and by Jamco Products Inc. (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2019
22 22 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 08/16 11:48 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/16/2019 re21 Telephonic Scheduling Conference regarding mediation proceedings. Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 242, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. See order for additional deadlines and details. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 08/16 11:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin: Telephonic Scheduling Conference regarding mediation proceedings held on 8/16/2019. Mediation set for 10/4/2019 at 9:00 am. Plaintiff's written settlement demand due 9/20/2019. Defendant's written settlement demand due 9/27/2019. Both parties to provide the court with relevant information by noon on 10/1/2019. (Tape #9:01:14 - 9:14:17 am) (lz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
20 20 3 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/13 10:57 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/13/2019.17 Parties' Stipulation for Referral to Mediation is ADOPTED; CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for one or more mediation conferences.18 Parties' Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline is ADOPTED in part. Dispositive motions now due by 9/20/2019; responses due by 10/11/2019; and replies due by 10/18/2019.19 Parties' Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 08/13 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference regarding Mediation Proceedings set for 8/16/2019 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Participants shall call the court's conference line at 888-278-0296 and use access code 8322317# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2019
19 19 misc Stipulation Mon 08/12 10:21 PM
STIPULATION by Dalco Metals and by Jamco Products Inc.(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Stipulation for Protective Order
18 18 misc Stipulation Mon 08/12 10:02 PM
STIPULATION by Dalco and by Jamco Products Inc.(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 08/12 9:59 PM
STIPULATION by Dalco Metals and by Jamco Products Inc.(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Referral to Magistrate for Mediation
Thursday, May 23, 2019
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 05/23 8:47 AM
DISREGARD; FILED IN ERROR DISCLOSURE Statement by Dalco Metals Inc. (Burrows, James) Modified on 5/23/2019 (asc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/23 10:26 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Jamco Products Inc.(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 1:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jamco Products Inc filed by Dalco Metals Inc.(blr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A & B (bookmarked)
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 04/09 10:23 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/9/2019 GRANTING13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2019
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/05 10:28 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Dalco Metals Inc.(Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint
Thursday, March 21, 2019
12 12 respoth Answer to Counterclaim Thu 03/21 4:51 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim re3 and Affirmative Defenses filed by Dalco Metals Inc. (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 03/21 1:56 PM
TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/21/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 8/30/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 1/13/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 1/17/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 1/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2019
10 10 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 03/15 4:01 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dalco Metals Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 03/15 12:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 3/15/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Tue 03/12 9:03 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Dalco Metals Inc. and by Jamco Products Inc. (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2019
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 03/06 3:06 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Dalco Metals Inc. (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P Bogart on behalf of Dalco Metals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven P. Bogart (Bogart, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James M Burrows on behalf of Dalco Metals Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: James M. Burrows (Burrows, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 02/28 6:06 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Jamco Products Inc. (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
3 3 respoth Answer and Counterclaim Thu 02/28 6:04 PM
Jamco Products Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Dalco Metals Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Jamco Products Inc . (Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
2 2 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/22 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/12/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 02/22 8:39 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/21 7:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jamco Products Inc from Walworth County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19-CV-56 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3038373)(Gierke, Nora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet