Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:19-ap-50027
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2019
Terminated:Jun 07, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Advance Publications, Inc
950 Fingerboard Road
Staten Island, NY 10305
Represented By
Advance Publications, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, June 07, 2019
7 7 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/07 8:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:19-ap-50027] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
6 6 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Thu 05/30 1:58 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Tue 02/26 2:07 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Advance Publications, Inc. dba The Plain Dealer Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, February 25, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 02/25 9:14 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/22 3:44 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 notice Appearance Fri 02/22 2:01 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/22 9:18 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50027 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Advance Publications, Inc [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50027 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1