Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Cox Enterprises, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50029 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cox Enterprises, Inc.
6205-A Peachtree Dunwoody Road
Atlanta, GA 30328 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Show Cause Hearing vacated per Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 8/14/2019 . (lat) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/22 8:57 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50029 Closed. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order to Appear and Show Cause re: Plaintiff for Failure to Prosecute . Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: Cox Enterprises, Inc. dba Dayton Daily News . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 19-50029 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Cox Enterprises, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50029 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |