Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:19-ap-50030
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2019
Terminated:Aug 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cox Enterprises, Inc
6205-A Peachtee Dunwoody Road
Atlanta, GA 30328
Represented By
Cox Enterprises, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, September 16, 2019
9 9 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Show Cause Hearing vacated per Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 8/14/2019 . (lat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
8 8 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/22 8:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50030 Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
7 7 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Wed 08/14 11:27 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
6 6 order Show Cause, Order to Appear and Mon 08/05 10:34 AM
Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute Related [+]. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Tue 02/26 2:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Cox Enterprises, Inc. dba The Atlanta Journal-Constitution Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, February 25, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 02/25 9:24 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/22 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 notice Appearance Fri 02/22 2:04 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/22 10:16 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50030 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Cox Enterprises, Inc [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50030 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1