Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Evening Post Industries, Inc
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50031 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Evening Post Industries, Inc
134 Columbus Street #400
Charleston, SC 29403 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, April 08, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Thu 04/08 10:40 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, October 02, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/02 8:11 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50031 Closed. (btw) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Fri 09/20 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/19/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Default Judgment, Order on Motion for
Tue 09/17 11:17 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Evening Post Industries, Inc . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Hearing vacated per Plaintiff's Application for Clerk's Entry of Default filed 9/6/2019 and Clerk's Entry of Default entered 9/9/2019 . (lat) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Mon 09/16 10:04 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 09/09 2:08 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Evening Post Industries, Inc . (btw) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Fri 09/06 4:29 PM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of
Fri 09/06 4:28 PM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Show Cause, Order to Appear and
Mon 08/05 10:36 AM
Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute . Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 02/26 2:18 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Evening Post Industries, Inc. dba The Post and Courier . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 02/25 9:30 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/22 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 02/22 2:05 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/22 10:20 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50031 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Evening Post Industries, Inc [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50031 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |