Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Gannett Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50034 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gannett Co., Inc.
7950 Jones Branch Drive
McLean, VA 22107 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/10 8:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50034 Closed. (btw) |
|
Thursday, August 06, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Thu 08/06 1:37 PM
Minute Entry/Order: Trial (Day 2 of 2): Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,18 . Trial (Day 2 of 2) vacated. Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/31/2020 (lat) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Tue 08/04 3:14 PM
Minute Entry/Order: Trial (Day 1 of 2): Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,18 . Trial (Day 1 of 2) vacated. Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/31/2020 (lat) |
|
Friday, July 31, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Fri 07/31 9:29 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Amy L Elson, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/10 12:25 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Establishing Deadlines . Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis on 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM EDT and 8/6/2020 at 09:00 AM EDT. Trial time allotted is two (2) days. Exhibit List due by 6/5/2020. Witness List due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2020. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
22 | 22
court
Minute Entry/Order Plain
Tue 12/10 9:39 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,18 . Disposition: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules two (2) day Trial for 8/5/20 beginning at 9:30 am and 8/6/20 beginning at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines. (hhd) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/09 11:30 AM
Appearance filed by Gregory J. Mascitti on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Mascitti, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 12/03 3:27 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jason R Burke, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 10/17 2:08 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference . Pretrial Conference set on 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM EST via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 12/3/2019. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 10/15 3:27 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Amy L Elson on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc . (Elson, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Tue 09/24 9:15 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 10/15/2019. Attorney for Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Mon 09/23 12:59 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Burke, Jason) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
|
|
14 | 14
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/16 9:54 AM
Appearance filed by Amy L Elson on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Elson, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Tue 09/10 10:25 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 9/23/2019. Attorney for Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Mon 09/09 4:09 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Burke, Jason) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 09/09 4:08 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Burke, Jason) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Appearance
Mon 09/09 4:08 PM
Appearance filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Gannett Co., Inc. (Burke, Jason) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice
Fri 08/30 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE . No. of Notices: 2 Notice Date 08/29/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 08/27 4:02 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Motion to Extend Time to File Adversary Documents . Deficiency to be cured by 9/10/2019. (btw) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Mon 08/26 1:09 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
order
Show Cause, Order to Appear and
Mon 08/05 10:43 AM
Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute . Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 02/26 2:20 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Gannett Co., Inc. dba The Cincinnati Enquirer Post . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 02/25 9:37 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/22 3:54 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 02/22 2:33 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/22 10:38 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50034 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Gannett Co., Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50034 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |