Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Gatehouse Media, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50037 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gatehouse Media, LLC
175 Sully's Trail Third Floor Corporate Crossings Office Park
Pittsford, NY 14534 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Friday, August 28, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Fri 08/28 2:25 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Reset Trial (Day 2 of 2) Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 14, 18. Reset Trial (Day 2 of 2) vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/28/2020. (lat) |
|
Wednesday, August 26, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 08/26 10:20 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Reset Trial (Day 1 of 2) Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 50214 ,18 . Reset Trial (Day 1 of 2) vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/28/2020. (lat) |
|
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 08/05 8:33 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50037 Closed. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Tue 08/11 10:43 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: FINAL Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 50214 , [18 ]. FINAL Telephonic Pretrial Conference vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/28/2020. (lat) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John R. Humphrey, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant CA Florida Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Notice of FINAL Telephonic Pretrial Conference on Amended Complaint . FINAL Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 8/11/2020 at 11:00 AM EDT via AT&T Conference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. (lat) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
![]() Order Granting Motion to Continue Trial . Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis on 8/26/2020 at 09:30 AM EDT and 8/27/2020 at 09:00 AM EDT. Trial time allotted is two (2) days. Exhibit List due by 6/26/2020. Witness List due by 6/26/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, February 06, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Motion to Continue Trial filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Scheduling Trial and Establishing Deadlines . Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis on 6/24/2020 at 09:30 AM EDT and 6/25/2020 at 09:00 AM EDT. Trial time allotted is two (2) days. Exhibit List due by 4/17/2020. Witness List due by 4/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
22 | 22
court
Minute Entry/Order Plain
Tue 12/17 9:17 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 And 550 And To Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 50214 ,18 . Disposition: Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules two (2) day Trial for 6/24/20 beginning at 9:30 am. and 6/25/20 beginning at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines.(hhd) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Joint Pretrial Statement filed by John R. Humphrey, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant CA Florida Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Order Scheduling Pretrial Conference and Establishing Deadlines . Pretrial Conference set on 12/17/2019 at 09:00 AM EST via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 12/10/2019. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant CA Florida Holdings, LLC [Corporate Parent(s): Cummings Acquisition, LLC, GHM Holdco, LLC, GHM Intermediate Holdco, LLC, GHM Operating, LLC, Gatehouse Media, LLC]. (Humphrey, John) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Answer to Amended Complaint filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant CA Florida Holdings, LLC . (Humphrey, John) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant CA Florida Holdings, LLC. (Humphrey, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: CA Florida Holdings, LLC dba Daytona Beach News-Journal . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 10/02/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 10/09/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 10/25/2019. (btw) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Amended Complaint (no parties added), filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Hearing vacated per Defendant's Stipulation of Extension of Time to Plead filed 8/23/2019 . (lat) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Service re: Order, filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Gatehouse Media, LLC . (Humphrey, John) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Approving Stipulation For Extension To Plead. Adversary Answer due by 9/23/2016 . Attorney for Defendant Gatehouse Media, LLC must distribute this order. (btw) CORRECTION: Adversary Answer due by 9/23/2019. Modified on 9/10/2019. (btw) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Gatehouse Media, LLC [Corporate Parent(s): New Media Holdings I LLC, New Media Holdings II LLC, New Media Investment Group Inc.]. (Humphrey, John) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 9/10/2019. (nar) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Stipulation of Facts/Documents filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Gatehouse Media, LLC . (Humphrey, John) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Gatehouse Media, LLC. (Humphrey, John) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause re: Failure to Prosecute . Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: Gatehouse Media, LLC dba Daytona Beach News-Journal . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 19-50037 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Gatehouse Media, LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50037 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |