Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:19-ap-50039
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2019
Terminated:Aug 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Gatehouse Media, LLC
175 Sully's Trail Third Floor Corporate Crossings Office Park
Pittsford, NY 14534
Represented By
Gatehouse Media, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, September 16, 2019
9 9 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Wed 09/18 2:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Failure to Prosecute1 . Disposition: Show Cause Hearing vacated per Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 8/14/2019 . (lat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2019
8 8 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/22 9:00 AM
Adversary Proceeding 1:19-ap-50039 Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
7 7 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Wed 08/14 11:30 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
6 6 order Show Cause, Order to Appear and Mon 08/05 10:52 AM
Order for Plaintiff to Appear and Show Cause re: Failure to Prosecute Related [+]. Telephonic Show Cause Hearing to be held on 9/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Tue 02/26 2:24 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Gatehouse Media, LLC dba The Palm Beach Post Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 4
Monday, February 25, 2019
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 02/25 9:43 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/22 3:59 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 notice Appearance Fri 02/22 2:36 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/22 11:16 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50039 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Gatehouse Media, LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50039 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1