Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Sun-Times Media, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50042 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sun-Times Media, LLC
30 N. Racine Avenue Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60607 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/07 9:02 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:19-ap-50042] Closed. (btw) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Thu 05/30 2:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 02/26 2:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Sun-Times Media, LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 02/25 9:46 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 03/04/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/11/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 3/27/2019. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 02/22 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 02/22 2:38 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/22 11:25 AM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50042 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Sun-Times Media, LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 02/22 3:07 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 19-50042 ) [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A29611639. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |